Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784183

EP2784183 - COMPOSITE BODY, COLLECTOR MEMBER, FUEL BATTERY CELL DEVICE, AND FUEL BATTERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kyocera Corporation
6 Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / FUJIMOTO, Tetsuro
c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION
6, Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
02 / HIGASHI, Masahiko
c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION
6, Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
 [2018/16]
Former [2014/40]01 / FUJIMOTO, Tetsuro
c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION
6 Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
02 / HIGASHI, Masahiko
c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION
6 Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[2018/16]
Former [2014/40]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12852302.426.11.2012
[2018/16]
WO2012JP80459
Priority number, dateJP2011025783825.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011257838
[2014/40]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013077445
Date:30.05.2013
Language:JA
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784183
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784183
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/0206, H01M8/0215, H01M8/0228, H01M8/0247, H01M8/124, H01M8/0254, C23C14/08, C23C26/00, C23C28/00, H01M2/20
[2017/46]
Former International [2015/25]C23C26/00, B32B9/00, C23C14/08, H01M8/02, H01M8/12, C23C28/00
Former International [2014/40]C23C26/00, B32B9/00, C23C14/08, H01M8/02, H01M8/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBUNDKÖRPER, KOLLEKTORELEMENT, BRENNSTOFFBATTERIEZELLENVORRICHTUNG UND BRENNSTOFFBATTERIEVORRICHTUNG[2014/40]
English:COMPOSITE BODY, COLLECTOR MEMBER, FUEL BATTERY CELL DEVICE, AND FUEL BATTERY DEVICE[2014/40]
French:CORPS COMPOSITE, ÉLÉMENT COLLECTEUR DE COURANT, DISPOSITIF DE CELLULE DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE, ET DISPOSITIF DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase19.05.2014Translation filed 
19.05.2014National basic fee paid 
19.05.2014Search fee paid 
19.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
26.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2018Fee for grant paid
08.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.11.2017
Opposition(s)21.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
21.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
IE26.11.2018
LU26.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
FR30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
[2019/51]
Former [2019/49]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
IE26.11.2018
LU26.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
FR30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
Former [2019/48]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
IE26.11.2018
LU26.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
Former [2019/40]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
LU26.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
Former [2019/34]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
LU26.11.2018
Former [2019/33]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL18.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2328218  (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * claims 1-6 *
International search[A]WO2011105578  (KYOCERA CORP.);
 [A]JP2008034202  (KYOCERA CORP.);
 [A]JP2010535290  (TRUSTEES OF BOSTON UNIVERSITY)
by applicantWO2011105578