Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783392

EP2783392 - SPECTRAL MATCHING BASED CALIBRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kla-Tencor Corporation
Legal Department
1 Technology Drive
Milpitas, California 95035 / US
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / KWAK, Hidong
2412 Denevi Drive
San Jose, California 95130 / US
02 / JIANG, Zhiming
5136 Rappolla Court
Pleasanton, California 94588 / US
03 / DIXON, Ward RDell
2522 Wood Hollow Drive
Livermore, California 94550 / US
04 / JAMES, Kenneth Edward
2300 Bayo Claros Circle
Morgan Hill, California 95037 / US
05 / POSLAVSKY, Leonid
2636 Monte Cresta Drive
Belmont, California 94002 / US
06 / KAACK, Torsten
1670 Jones Lane
Los Altos, California 94024 / US
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Coyle, Philip Aidan
F. R. Kelly & Co.
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date12852321.420.11.2012
[2016/37]
WO2012US66131
Priority number, dateUS201161562154P21.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161562154 P
US20121368027319.11.2012         Original published format: US201213680273
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013078239
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783392
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2783392
Date:14.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR30.05.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/66, G01N21/21, G03F7/20
[2015/43]
Former International [2014/40]H01L21/66
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUF SPEKTRALABGLEICH BASIERENDE KALIBRIERUNG[2016/22]
English:SPECTRAL MATCHING BASED CALIBRATION[2014/40]
French:CALIBRAGE BASÉ SUR LA CORRESPONDANCE SPECTRALE[2014/40]
Former [2014/40]AUF SPEKTRALABGLEICH BASIERENDEN KALIBRIERUNG
Entry into regional phase23.06.2014National basic fee paid 
23.06.2014Search fee paid 
23.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
05.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2016Fee for grant paid
29.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.05.2016
Opposition(s)15.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.11.2012
AL14.09.2016
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
TR14.09.2016
IE20.11.2016
MT20.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
GB14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU20.11.2012
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
TR14.09.2016
IE20.11.2016
MT20.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
GB14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2018/43]HU20.11.2012
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
IE20.11.2016
MT20.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
GB14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2018/30]HU20.11.2012
AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CY14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
MC14.09.2016
MK14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
IE20.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
GB14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/51]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
IE20.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
GB14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/50]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SI14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
IE20.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/43]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/35]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
DK14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/23]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
ES14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
IT14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
SM14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
PT16.01.2017
Former [2017/23]AT14.09.2016
BE14.09.2016
CZ14.09.2016
EE14.09.2016
FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
PL14.09.2016
RO14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
SK14.09.2016
BG14.12.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
IS14.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
LV14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO14.12.2016
GR15.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI14.09.2016
HR14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
RS14.09.2016
SE14.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO14.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI14.09.2016
LT14.09.2016
NO14.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT14.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US5798837  (ASPNES DAVID E [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 44 *;
 [A]US7075649  (JOHS BLAINE D [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US5581350  (CHEN XING [US] ET AL) [A] 1,2,11 * abstract *;
 [A]US2011176133  (DANG JIANG-TAO [CN] ET AL) [A] 1,11 * abstract *
International search[A]US2009103081  (MIKE WHELAN ET AL.);
 [A]US2011178785  (PATRICIUS ALOYSIUS JACOBUS TINNEMANS ET AL.);
 [A]US2002109839  (ROBERT J. FAUS ET AL.);
 [A]US2006138344  (STEPHEN J. GUNSTREAM ET AL.);
 [A]KR100956209B  (SAMSUNG ELECTRO-MECHANICS CO., LTD.)