Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787374

EP2787374 - OPTICAL FILM, SURFACE LIGHT EMITTING BODY, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICAL FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.10.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8251 / JP
[2017/35]
Former [2017/28]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8251 / JP
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd.
1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8253 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OKUNO, Daichi
c/o Yokohama Corporate Research Laboratories
Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd.
10-1, Daikoku-cho, Tsurumi-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0053 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]01 / OKUNO Daichi
c/o Yokohama Corporate Research Laboratories
Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd.
10-1, Daikoku-cho
Tsurumi-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 230-0053 / JP
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date12852523.514.11.2012
WO2012JP79489
Priority number, dateJP2011026029629.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011260296
JP2012009049111.04.2012         Original published format: JP 2012090491
JP2012008995711.04.2012         Original published format: JP 2012089957
JP2012011230016.05.2012         Original published format: JP 2012112300
JP2012015040504.07.2012         Original published format: JP 2012150405
[2014/41]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013080794
Date:06.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787374
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:G02B3/00, B29C39/18, G02B5/02, H01L51/50, H05B33/02, B29L7/00, B29L11/00
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:OPTISCHE FOLIE, OBERFLÄCHENLICHTEMITTIERENDER KÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER OPTISCHEN FOLIE[2014/41]
English:OPTICAL FILM, SURFACE LIGHT EMITTING BODY, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICAL FILM[2014/41]
French:FILM OPTIQUE, CORPS D'ÉMISSION LUMINEUSE DE SURFACE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE FILM OPTIQUE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase26.05.2014Translation filed 
26.05.2014National basic fee paid 
26.05.2014Search fee paid 
26.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
27.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/45]
28.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010246161  (GOTO MASAHIRO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-6,9 * pages 66-68; figure 3 *;
 [X]JP2008305590  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,6,9 * paragraphs [0028] , [0030]; figures 2,3 *;
 [X]JP2011159632  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,6,9 * paragraphs [0023] , [0026]; figure 4 *;
 [X]JP2007133196  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,2,9 * abstract *;
 [XDI]JP2009025774  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [XD] 1,7,9 * paragraph [0031]; figure 11a * [I] 8;
 [XD]JP2011123204  (SAMSUNG YOKOHAMA RES INST CO) [XD] 1 * paragraph [0025] *;
 [A]WO03061983  (NANOVENTIONS INC [US]; STEENBLIK RICHARD A [US]; HURT MARK J [US]; KNO) [A] 1 * page 15, line 7 - page 16, line 2 *;
 [X]WO2008093819  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]; GOTO MASAHIRO [JP]; KODAMA DAIJIRO [JP) [X] 3 * figure 3 *;
 [A]WO2009151171  (MIRAENANOTECH CO LTD [KR]) [A] 10-12 * paragraphs [0087] - [0092] *;
 [A]US2005224997  (LIAO TSUNG-NENG [TW] ET AL) [A] 10-12 * paragraphs [0021] - [0028] *
International search[X]JP2007133196  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.);
 [X]WO2008093819  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.);
 [X]JP2008305590  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.);
 [X]JP2011159632  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.);
 [X]JPH10111537  (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2008058494  (HITACHI MAXELL, LTD.)
by applicantJP2011123204
 JP2009025774
 WO2008069324