Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786864

EP2786864 - POLYLACTIC ACID RESIN SHEET AND MOLDED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toray Industries, Inc.
1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8666 / JP
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / YAKUSHIDOU, Kenichi
c/o Shiga Plant
Toray Industries Inc.
1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP
02 / TABATA, Hisataka
c/o Shiga Plant
Toray Industries Inc.
1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP
03 / ISHII, Takeshi
c/o Shiga Plant
Toray Industries Inc.
1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome
Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte
Sohnckestraße 12
81479 München / DE
[2016/29]
Former [2014/41]Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date12852609.213.11.2012
[2016/29]
WO2012JP79406
Priority number, dateJP2011026145230.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011261452
[2014/41]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013080788
Date:06.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786864
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2786864
Date:20.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/18, B32B27/30, B32B27/36, C08K5/00, C08L33/04, C08L67/04, C08L101/16, A61K8/00
[2015/29]
Former International [2014/41]B32B27/18, B32B27/30, B32B27/36, C08K5/00, C08L33/04, C08L67/04, C08L101/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYMILCHSÄUREHARZFOLIE UND FORMKÖRPER[2014/41]
English:POLYLACTIC ACID RESIN SHEET AND MOLDED BODY[2014/41]
French:FEUILLE DE RÉSINE D'ACIDE POLYLACTIQUE ET CORPS MOULÉ[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase13.05.2014Translation filed 
13.05.2014National basic fee paid 
13.05.2014Search fee paid 
13.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
29.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2016Fee for grant paid
13.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.02.2016
Opposition(s)21.04.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.11.2012
AL20.07.2016
AT20.07.2016
BE20.07.2016
CY20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
MK20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
TR20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IE13.11.2016
MT13.11.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU13.11.2012
AT20.07.2016
BE20.07.2016
CY20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
MK20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
TR20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IE13.11.2016
MT13.11.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/43]HU13.11.2012
AT20.07.2016
BE20.07.2016
CY20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
MK20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IE13.11.2016
MT13.11.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/30]HU13.11.2012
AT20.07.2016
BE20.07.2016
CY20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
MK20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IE13.11.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/51]AT20.07.2016
BE20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IE13.11.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/43]AT20.07.2016
BE20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT20.07.2016
BE20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
Former [2017/35]AT20.07.2016
BE20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
Former [2017/31]AT20.07.2016
BE20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
Former [2017/13]AT20.07.2016
BE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT20.07.2016
BE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
Former [2017/10]BE20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
NO20.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
NO20.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT20.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2599821  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [E] 1 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO2011092989  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]; TABATA HISATAKA [JP]; MATSUMOTO TAISEI [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [Y]JP2007331154  (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [AD]JP2008221504  (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [AD] 1-9 * abstract *
International search[A]JP2005036088  (RIKEN VITAMIN CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2007331154  (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS, INC.);
 [A]JPH09141803  (TEIJIN LTD.);
 [A]JP2004067801  (RIKEN VITAMIN CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2002012687
 JP2002114895
 JPH1017757
 JP2004067801
 JP2005171204
 JP2008221504
 JP2006036808
 JP2003238672
    - MACROMOLECULES, (1987), vol. 20, page 904