Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787268

EP2787268 - HIGH TEMPERATURE VACUUM INSULATION PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Hausys, Ltd.
One IFC
10 Gukjegeumyung-ro
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / JEON, Seung-Min
212-1002, 12, Jeonggwan
5-ro, Jeonggwan-myeon
Gijang-gun
Busan 619-963 / KR
02 / HWANG, Sung-Seock
3-212 Samil Apt.
Biha-dong
Heungdeok-gu
Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 361-370 / KR
03 / HAN, Jung-Pil
209-702, 26, Daeam-ro
Nam-gu
Ulsan 680-795 / KR
04 / MIN, Byung-Hoon
A-402, 26, Bongwol-ro
27beon-gil, Nam-gu
Ulsan 680-832 / KR
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[2017/42]
Former [2014/45]Zacco Sweden AB
Valhallavägen 117
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2014/41]Melin Granberg, Linda
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date12852869.229.11.2012
[2017/42]
WO2012KR10245
Priority number, dateKR2011012856602.12.2011         Original published format: KR 20110128566
[2014/41]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013081395
Date:06.06.2013
Language:KO
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787268
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2787268
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:F16L59/065, F16L59/04, H05B6/64, F24C15/34, F24B1/24
[2015/33]
Former International [2014/41]F16L59/065, F16L59/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HOCHTEMPERATUR-VAKUUMDÄMMPLATTE[2014/41]
English:HIGH TEMPERATURE VACUUM INSULATION PANEL[2014/41]
French:PANNEAU D'ISOLATION DE VIDE À HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2014Translation filed 
15.05.2014National basic fee paid 
15.05.2014Search fee paid 
15.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
25.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2017Fee for grant paid
08.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.06.2016
Opposition(s)19.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.11.2012
AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE29.11.2017
LU29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
FR18.12.2017
BG18.01.2018
GB18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
[2019/31]
Former [2018/52]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE29.11.2017
LU29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
FR18.12.2017
BG18.01.2018
GB18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/50]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE29.11.2017
LU29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
FR18.12.2017
BG18.01.2018
GB18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/49]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE29.11.2017
LU29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
FR18.12.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/45]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
IE29.11.2017
LU29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/43]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
LU29.11.2017
MT29.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
LU29.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
LU29.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/38]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
LU29.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/36]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
NO18.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL18.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP1640148  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5,7,12-18 * paragraphs [0013] , [0097] , [0096] , [0099] , [0144] , [0066] , [0098] , [0050] * [Y] 2-4 [I] 6,8;
 [X]KR20110101786  (LG HAUSYS LTD [KR]) [X] 1,9,10 * figures 4,6 *;
 [X]JP2006077799  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0028] , [0048] *;
 [X]US2001008671  (KURODA TOSHIYA [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,9,11 * paragraph [0054] *;
 [Y]WO2011133778  (UNIFRAX I LLC [US]; FERNANDO JOSEPH A [US]; MILLER KENNETH B [US]) [Y] 2-4 * claim 27 *;
 [A]WO2011019394  (UNIFRAX I LLC [US]; KUMAR AMIT [US]; FERNANDES JR SERGIO DAVID [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[Y]KR20110072795  (LG HAUSYS, LTD.);
 [Y]KR20110101786  (LG HAUSYS, LTD.);
 [Y]KR20050115291  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2010060048  (PANASONIC CORP.);
 [A]KR100950834B  (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC.)
ExaminationEP1607217