Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785350

EP2785350 - IMPROVED METHODS OF TREATING ISCHEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fate Therapeutics, Inc.
Suite 200, 3535 General Atomics Court
San Diego, California 92121 / US
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / SHOEMAKER, Dan
5481 Caminito Exquisito
San Diego California 92130 / US
02 / MULTANI, Pratik, S.
6293 Belmont Trail Court
San Diego California 92130 / US
03 / MENDLEIN, John, D.
1550 Neptune Avenue
Encinitas California 92024 / US
04 / ROBBINS, David
32534 Angelo Drive
Temecula California 92592 / US
 [2014/47]
Former [2014/41]01 / SHOEMAKER, Dan
5481 Caminito Exquisito
San Diego California 92130 / US
02 / MULTANI, Pratik, S.
10486 Harvest View Way
San Diego California 92128 / US
03 / MENDLEIN, John, D.
1550 Neptune Avenue
Encinitas California 92024 / US
04 / ROBBINS, David
32534 Angelo Drive
Temecula California 92592 / US
Representative(s)Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Ganghoferstraße 68 B
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/18]Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Landsberger Straße 98
80339 München / DE
Former [2014/41]Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Straße 98
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date12852924.529.11.2012
[2018/18]
WO2012US66984
Priority number, dateUS201161566494P02.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161566494 P
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013082241
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2785350
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785350
Date:02.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/5575, A61K31/573, A61P9/10, A61P9/00, A61K35/28, C12N5/0789, A61K35/12
[2015/22]
Former International [2014/41]A61K31/5575, A61K31/573, A61P9/10, A61P9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ISCHÄMIE[2014/41]
English:IMPROVED METHODS OF TREATING ISCHEMIA[2014/41]
French:MÉTHODES AMÉLIORÉES PERMETTANT DE TRAITER L'ISCHÉMIE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase02.07.2014National basic fee paid 
02.07.2014Search fee paid 
02.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
30.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2018Fee for grant paid
23.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18169424.1  / EP3381456
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.05.2016
Opposition(s)05.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
LU29.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/34]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
LU29.11.2018
Former [2019/33]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
MC02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SI02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
SM02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT02.05.2018
CZ02.05.2018
DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
PL02.05.2018
RO02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
SK02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK02.05.2018
EE02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK02.05.2018
FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/52]FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
NL02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
GR03.08.2018
Former [2018/51]FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
LV02.05.2018
RS02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/50]FI02.05.2018
HR02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/49]FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
SE02.05.2018
BG02.08.2018
NO02.08.2018
Former [2018/47]FI02.05.2018
LT02.05.2018
NO02.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]CA2743255  (AMORCYTE INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0027] , [ 455]; claims 37,59 *;
 [X]  - TANJA HERRLER ET AL, "Prostaglandin E Positively Modulates Endothelial Progenitor Cell Homeostasis: An Advanced Treatment Modality for Autologous Cell Therapy", JOURNAL OF VASCULAR RESEARCH, (20090101), vol. 46, no. 4, doi:10.1159/000189794, ISSN 1018-1172, pages 333 - 346, XP055002077 [X] 1-15 * page 334, column 2, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000189794
 [Y]  - J. HOGGATT ET AL, "Prostaglandin E2 enhances hematopoietic stem cell homing, survival, and proliferation", BLOOD, (20090326), vol. 113, no. 22, doi:10.1182/blood-2009-01-201335, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 5444 - 5455, XP055002065 [Y] 1-15 * page 5447, paragraph last *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2009-01-201335
 [Y]  - LOUIS M PELUS ET AL, "Pleiotropic effects of prostaglandin Ein hematopoiesis; prostaglandin Eand other eicosanoids regulate hematopoietic stem and progenitor cell function", PROSTAGLANDINS AND OTHER LIPID MEDIATORS, ELSEVIER, US, vol. 96, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.PROSTAGLANDINS.2011.06.004, ISSN 1098-8823, (20110614), pages 3 - 9, (20110621), XP028108764 [Y] 1-15 * page 5, column 1, paragraph last *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.prostaglandins.2011.06.004
 [Y]  - WOLFRAM GOESSLING ET AL, "Prostaglandin E2 Enhances Human Cord Blood Stem Cell Xenotransplants and Shows Long-Term Safety in Preclinical Nonhuman Primate Transplant Models", CELL STEM CELL, (20110401), vol. 8, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.stem.2011.02.003, ISSN 1934-5909, pages 445 - 458, XP055002056 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.stem.2011.02.003
 [A]  - QUILING WU ET AL, "Extracellular calcium increases CXCR4 expression on bone marrow-derived cells and enhances pro-angiogenesis therapy", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR MEDICINE, (20090211), vol. 13, no. 9b, doi:10.1111/j.1582-4934.2009.00691.x, ISSN 1582-1838, pages 3764 - 3773, XP055183860 [A] 1-15 * page 5, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1582-4934.2009.00691.x