Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787381

EP2787381 - IMAGE CAPTURE UNIT AND IMAGE CAPTURE UNIT MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Olympus Corporation
2951 Ishikawa-machi
Hachioji-shi
Tokyo 192-8507 / JP
[2017/01]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Olympus Corporation
43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YOSHIDA Kazuhiro
c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION
43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome
Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-0072 / JP
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date12852938.507.09.2012
WO2012JP72880
Priority number, dateJP2011026376401.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011263764
[2014/41]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013080622
Date:06.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787381
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:G02B7/02, H04N5/225, H01L27/146
[2015/27]
Former International [2014/41]G02B7/02, H04N5/225
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:BILDAUFNAHMEEINHEIT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE BILDAUFNAHMEEINHEIT[2014/48]
English:IMAGE CAPTURE UNIT AND IMAGE CAPTURE UNIT MANUFACTURING METHOD[2014/41]
French:UNITÉ DE CAPTURE D'IMAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNITÉ DE CAPTURE D'IMAGE[2014/41]
Former [2014/41]BILDUAFNAHMEEINHEIT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE BILDUAFNAHMEEINHEIT
Entry into regional phase12.06.2014Translation filed 
12.06.2014National basic fee paid 
12.06.2014Search fee paid 
12.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
01.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
06.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
10.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XAYI]US2006264703  (FUJIMORI NORIYUKI [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0054] * * figures 12-16 * [A] 7,8 [Y] 4-6,13 [I] 2,3;
 [XAYI]US2005110889  (TUTTLE MARK E [US] ET AL) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0060] * * figures 7,12 * [A] 7,8 [Y] 4-6,10,12,13 [I] 11;
 [Y]JP2009080166  (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 5,6,12 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0039] *;
 [Y]US2009085138  (RYU JIN MUN [KR] ET AL) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0107] * * figures 15-17 *
International search[Y]JP2010114731  (TOSHIBA CORP.);
 [Y]JP2009284260  (SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2008166939  (I SQUARE RESEARCH CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2003043327  (JAPAN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CORP.);
 [A]JP2009271405  (MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2008166939