EP2787381 - IMAGE CAPTURE UNIT AND IMAGE CAPTURE UNIT MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2017/01] |
Former [2014/41] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA Kazuhiro c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2014/41] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 12852938.5 | 07.09.2012 | WO2012JP72880 | Priority number, date | JP20110263764 | 01.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011263764 | [2014/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013080622 | Date: | 06.06.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2787381 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.06.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/02, H04N5/225, H01L27/146 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
G02B7/021 (EP,US);
G02B7/023 (EP,US);
H01L27/14618 (EP,US);
H04N23/57 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/41] | G02B7/02, H04N5/225 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Title | German: | BILDAUFNAHMEEINHEIT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE BILDAUFNAHMEEINHEIT | [2014/48] | English: | IMAGE CAPTURE UNIT AND IMAGE CAPTURE UNIT MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2014/41] | French: | UNITÉ DE CAPTURE D'IMAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNITÉ DE CAPTURE D'IMAGE | [2014/41] |
Former [2014/41] | BILDUAFNAHMEEINHEIT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE BILDUAFNAHMEEINHEIT | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2014 | Translation filed | 12.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/41] | 01.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/35] | 23.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2005110889 (TUTTLE MARK E [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0060] * * figures 7,12 * [A] 7,8 [Y] 4-6,10,12,13 [I] 11; | [XAYI]US2006264703 (FUJIMORI NORIYUKI [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0054] * * figures 12-16 * [A] 7,8 [Y] 4-6,13 [I] 2,3; | [Y]US2009085138 (RYU JIN MUN [KR], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0107] ** figures 15-17 *; | [Y]JP2009080166 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 5,6,12 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0039] * | International search | [Y]JP2003043327 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2008166939 (SQUARE RES CO LTD I); | [A]JP2009271405 (MITSUMI ELECTRIC CO LTD ); | [Y]JP2009284260 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO); | [Y]JP2010114731 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) | by applicant | JP2008166939 |