Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787379

EP2787379 - OPTICAL RECEPTACLE AND OPTICAL MODULE PROVIDED WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Enplas Corporation
30-1, Namiki 2-chome Kawaguchi-shi
Saitama 332-0034 / JP
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / MORIOKA Shimpei
c/o Enplas Corporation
30-1 Namiki 2-chome
Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0034 / JP
02 / NIIMI Tadanobu
c/o Enplas Corporation
30-1 Namiki 2-chome
Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0034 / JP
03 / KANKE Shinya
c/o Enplas Corporation
30-1 Namiki 2-chome
Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0034 / JP
04 / TANAZAWA Masahiro
c/o Enplas Corporation
30-1 Namiki 2-chome
Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0034 / JP
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Murgitroyd House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/44]Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2014/41]Harrasz, Julia Konstanze
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date12852944.312.11.2012
[2018/44]
WO2012JP79245
Priority number, dateJP2011026464402.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011264644
JP2012022408609.10.2012         Original published format: JP 2012224086
[2014/41]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013080783
Date:06.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787379
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2787379
Date:31.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/42
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:OPTISCHER BEHÄLTER UND OPTISCHES MODUL DAMIT[2014/41]
English:OPTICAL RECEPTACLE AND OPTICAL MODULE PROVIDED WITH SAME[2014/41]
French:PRISE OPTIQUE ET MODULE OPTIQUE ÉQUIPÉ DE CELLE-CI[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase20.06.2014Translation filed 
20.06.2014National basic fee paid 
20.06.2014Search fee paid 
20.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
25.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
06.09.2018Fee for grant paid
06.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.09.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
19.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.10.2016
Opposition(s)01.08.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SI31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
IE12.11.2018
LU12.11.2018
MT12.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
FR31.12.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
[2020/08]
Former [2019/50]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SI31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
IE12.11.2018
LU12.11.2018
BE30.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
FR31.12.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/49]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SI31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
IE12.11.2018
LU12.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
FR31.12.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/48]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
IE12.11.2018
LU12.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/40]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
MC31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SK31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
LU12.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/37]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
EE31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RO31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
SM31.10.2018
LU12.11.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/35]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
CZ31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
LU12.11.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
DK31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
IT31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
LU12.11.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL31.10.2018
AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
PT01.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
RS31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
SE31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
GR01.02.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT31.10.2018
ES31.10.2018
FI31.10.2018
HR31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
LV31.10.2018
NL31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/22]FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
PL31.10.2018
BG31.01.2019
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT31.10.2018
NO31.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2011211152  (ENPLAS CORP) [Y] 1-14 * figure 1 * * figures 2-3 *;
 [Y]JP2007171427  (ENPLAS CORP) [Y] 1-14 * figure 6 * * paragraph [0008] *;
 [Y]JPH09127375  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 11,12 * figure 5 *;
 [Y]JP2011039151  (ENPLAS CORP) [Y] 11,13 * figure 1 *
International search[Y]JP2011211152  (ENPLAS CORP);
 [Y]JP2007171427  (ENPLAS CORP);
 [Y]JPH09127375  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [Y]JP2011039151  (ENPLAS CORP)
by applicantJP2000340877
 JP2004221420
 JP2008151894