Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786979

EP2786979 - METHOD FOR PURIFYING 1,3-BUTADIENE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Chemicals Corporation
1-105 Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8101 / JP
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAHARA, Tatsuto
1-105, Kanda Jinbocho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 1018101 / JP
02 / NAKANO, Hiroshi
1-105, Kanda Jinbocho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 1018101 / JP
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date12852999.727.11.2012
[2016/05]
WO2012JP80609
Priority number, dateJP2011025913028.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011259130
[2014/41]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013080967
Date:06.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786979
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2786979
Date:03.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07C7/10, C07C11/167, C08F2/00, C08F36/06
[2015/16]
Former International [2014/41]C07C7/00, C07C7/05, C07C7/12, C07C11/167, C08F2/00, C08F36/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON 1,3-BUTADIEN[2014/41]
English:METHOD FOR PURIFYING 1,3-BUTADIENE[2014/41]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION DU 1,3-BUTADIÈNE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase08.05.2014Translation filed 
30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Search fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
15.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
25.11.2015Fee for grant paid
25.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.07.2015
Opposition(s)04.11.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.11.2012
AL03.02.2016
AT03.02.2016
BE03.02.2016
CY03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
EE03.02.2016
ES03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
IT03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
MC03.02.2016
MK03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
SI03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
TR03.02.2016
BG03.05.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU27.11.2012
AT03.02.2016
BE03.02.2016
CY03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
EE03.02.2016
ES03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
IT03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
MC03.02.2016
MK03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
SI03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
TR03.02.2016
BG03.05.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2018/30]HU27.11.2012
AT03.02.2016
BE03.02.2016
CY03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
EE03.02.2016
ES03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
IT03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
MC03.02.2016
MK03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
SI03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
BG03.05.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2017/16]AT03.02.2016
BE03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
EE03.02.2016
ES03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
IT03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
SI03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
BG03.05.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2017/03]AT03.02.2016
BE03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
EE03.02.2016
ES03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
IT03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2016/50]AT03.02.2016
CZ03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
EE03.02.2016
ES03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
IT03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RO03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
SK03.02.2016
SM03.02.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2016/49]AT03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
EE03.02.2016
ES03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
IT03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2016/46]AT03.02.2016
DK03.02.2016
ES03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
IT03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2016/39]AT03.02.2016
ES03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
IT03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
LV03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
RS03.02.2016
SE03.02.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2016/38]AT03.02.2016
ES03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
IT03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
IS03.06.2016
PT03.06.2016
Former [2016/36]AT03.02.2016
ES03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
IT03.02.2016
LT03.02.2016
NL03.02.2016
PL03.02.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
Former [2016/35]ES03.02.2016
FI03.02.2016
HR03.02.2016
NO03.05.2016
GR04.05.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US6093285  (FERNALD DANIEL T [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010104579  (EXXONMOBIL RES & ENG CO [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * example -; claim - *
 [A]  - C. F Lóss ET AL, "Recovery of p-TBC from a butadiene washing stream in a pilot plant", Brazilian Journal of Chemical Engineering, doi:10.1590/S0104-66322009000400001, (20091201), pages 635 - 640, URL: http://www.scielo.br/scielo.php?script=sci_arttext&pid=S0104-66322009000400001, (20150302), XP055173078 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1590/S0104-66322009000400001
International search[A]JPS477321  (ARUBERUTO, ACHIRIO, GERON);
 [A]JPH08310979  (BRIDGESTONE CORP);
 [A]JPS61158936  (SHELL INT RESEARCH);
 [A]JPS5572124  (NIPPON ZEON CO);
 [A]JP2000513007  (RHODIA CHIMIE)
by applicantUS5708092
 GB2241239
 US5527753
    - Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, (1985), vol. A4, pages 438 - 439
    - Shin Polymer Seizou Process, KOGYO CHOSAKAI PUBLISHING CO,. LTD., (1994), page 298