Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2786979 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2786979



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 289
07.12.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.02.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.01.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.10.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.10.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
27.10.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
27.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.07.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.07.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
15.07.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.07.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 60
15.07.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 60
23.06.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
13.03.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.03.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
02.03.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
09.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.06.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.06.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
25.06.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
08.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.05.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.05.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
08.05.2014 Description Search / examination 54
08.05.2014 Drawings Search / examination 4
08.05.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
11.04.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
27.06.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
06.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
06.06.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
06.06.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 35