Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2786979


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
07.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
17.03.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
09.12.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.01.2017  [2017/02]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
26.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.09.2016  [2016/39]
19.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.09.2016  [2016/38]
12.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
29.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
01.01.2016 (Expected) grant published on  03.02.2016  [2016/05]
02.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.11.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
03.11.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
14.07.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.03.2015 Change - classification published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
13.03.2015 Change - classification published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
13.03.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
30.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
02.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
05.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
05.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
09.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication