Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786533

EP2786533 - GATEWAY DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.11.2019 [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ulterius Technologies LLC
4601 East Douglas
Wichita, KS 67218 / US
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / CAVGALAR, Alexandros
3702 North Coolidge Street
Wichita, KS 67204 / US
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date12853054.030.11.2012
WO2012US67343
Priority number, dateUS201161565473P30.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161565473 P
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013082456
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786533
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/66, H04L12/28, H04N21/41, H04N21/4147, H04N21/436, H04N21/4402, H04N21/472
[2015/51]
Former International [2014/41]H04L12/66
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:GATEWAY-VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN[2014/41]
English:GATEWAY DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD[2014/41]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PASSERELLE, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2014National basic fee paid 
27.06.2014Search fee paid 
27.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
08.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/45]
01.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2019/45]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201706   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2018
30.11.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2007136621  (AUTONET MOBILE INC [US]; MOELLER DOUGLAS S [US]) [X] 1-7,10 * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 20 * * page 7, line 21 - line 23 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 8,9,11-13;
 [A]EP1309132  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0125] * * figures 1-15 *;
 [A]US2009325566  (BELL MICHAEL [US] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0183] - paragraph [0185] *;
 [A]US2008008125  (PHAM CUONG [US] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-4 *
International search[X]US2008219274  (HIROMITSU KATO ET AL.);
 [X]US2003117298  (MASAHIRO TOKUNAGA ET AL.);
 [A]US2007019631  (YUN-SEOK JANG);
 [A]US6957275  (KIYONORI SEKIGUCHI)