Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786271

EP2786271 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR GENERATING SEMANTIC SIGNATURES FOR MEDIA CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.10.2016
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.11.2016  [2016/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
[2015/32]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / SATHISH, Sailesh Kumar
Tohtorinkatu 7 B 6
FI-33720 Tampere / FI
02 / MATE, Sujeet Shyamsundar
Nosturinraitti 2 A 1
FI-33720 Tampere / FI
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Nokia EPO representatives
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Nokia Corporation
Intellectual Property Department
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Application number, filing date12853270.225.10.2012
WO2012FI51027
Priority number, dateUS20111330783130.11.2011         Original published format: US201113307831
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013079773
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786271
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:FI06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/27, G06F17/30
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM GENERIEREN SEMANTISCHER SIGNATUREN FÜR MEDIENINHALTE[2014/41]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR GENERATING SEMANTIC SIGNATURES FOR MEDIA CONTENT[2014/41]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS POUR GÉNÉRER DES SIGNATURES SÉMANTIQUES POUR UN CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase19.05.2014National basic fee paid 
19.05.2014Search fee paid 
19.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
12.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/46]
22.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011258188  (ABDALMAGEED WAEL [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9,11,12,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0050]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0063] * [I] 3,6,7,10,13,14;
 [XI]US2008288537  (GOLOVCHINSKY GENE [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,12,15 * abstract * * claim 1 * [I] 3,4,6,7,10,11,13,14
International search[X]US2008089665  (THAMBIRATNAM ALBERT J K ET AL.);
 [X]US2004117725  (CHEN FRANCINE R ET AL.);
 [A]WO2011121176  (NOKIA CORP ET AL.)