Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2786271 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2786271



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 205
26.10.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.10.2016 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
22.06.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no declaration of maintenance of the application/non-reply to the Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
29.09.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
11.09.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.09.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
11.09.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
03.09.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
07.07.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
18.06.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 58
23.09.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
10.09.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.06.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
19.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.05.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
19.05.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
07.05.2014 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 2
11.04.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
26.06.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 62
06.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
06.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 40