Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2786271


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.10.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
21.06.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
15.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.09.2015 Change - classification published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
11.09.2015 Change - classification published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
11.09.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
03.07.2015 Change - applicant published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
06.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
17.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
05.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
24.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
22.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.05.2014 Amendment by applicant
17.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication