Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2786271
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2786271Global Dossier 14.10.2015A4
EP2786271 08.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012FI51027 25.10.2012
US201113307831 30.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013079773Global Dossier 06.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113307831 30.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2013138654Global Dossier 30.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113307831 30.11.2011