Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785723

EP2785723 - DIFLUOROMETHYLATION OF UNSATURATED COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Scripps Research Institute
10550 North Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / BARAN, Phil, S.
5160 Great Meadow Drive
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
02 / DIXON, Janice, Akemi
2140 Medical District Dr., Apt. 2093
Dallas, TX 75235 / US
03 / BAXTER, Ryan
7560 Charmant Drive 1518
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
04 / FUJIWARA, Yuta
5-24-7, Tomioka
Wakkanai-shi Hokkaido 097-0012 / JP
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date12853283.527.11.2012
[2016/40]
WO2012US66653
Priority number, dateUS201161565756P01.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161565756 P
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013082028
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785723
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785723
Date:05.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:C07F3/06, C07F13/00, C07D473/04, C07B37/02, C07B39/00, C07D233/84, C07C313/04, C07D263/58, C07D277/74
[2015/31]
Former International [2014/41]C07F3/06, C07F13/00, C07D473/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIFLUORMETHYLIERUNG VON UNGESÄTTIGTEN VERBINDUNGEN[2014/41]
English:DIFLUOROMETHYLATION OF UNSATURATED COMPOUNDS[2014/41]
French:DIFLUOROMÉTHYLATION DE COMPOSÉS INSATURÉS[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2014National basic fee paid 
26.06.2014Search fee paid 
26.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
22.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.2016Fee for grant paid
26.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.04.2016
Opposition(s)06.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.11.2012
AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CY05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
MK05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
TR05.10.2016
IE27.11.2016
MT27.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
[2018/45]
Former [2018/43]HU27.11.2012
AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CY05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
MK05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
IE27.11.2016
MT27.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2018/30]HU27.11.2012
AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CY05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
MK05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
IE27.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/51]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
IE27.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/43]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/38]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/37]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/34]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/33]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/26]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/23]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV05.10.2016
BE30.11.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9623754  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]; SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB]; CHRISTENSEN) [A] 1-26 * claim - *
 [X]  - ZILI CHEN ET AL, "Zn(ODf)2: preparation and application in asymmetric alkynylation of aldehydes", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (20020911), vol. 1, no. 18, doi:10.1039/b206868k, ISSN 1359-7345, pages 2098 - 2099, XP055047641 [X] 1 * example 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b206868k
International search[A]US4424382  (OLAH, GEORGE A.);
 [XP]  - FUJIWARA, YUTA ET AL., "A New Reagent for Direct Difluoromethylation", J. AM. CHEM.SOC., (20120109), vol. 134, pages 1494 - 1497, XP055155791

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja211422g
 [A]  - JI, YINING ET AL., "Innate C-H trifluoromethylation of heterocycles", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20110830), vol. 108, no. 35, pages 14411 - 14415, XP055091902

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1109059108
 [A]  - BILLARD, TIERRY ET AL., "A New Route to Thio- and Selenosulfonates from Disulfides and Diselenides. Application to the Synthesis of New Thio- and Selenoesters of Triflic Acid", J. ORG. CHEM., (19961018), vol. 61, pages 7545 - 7550, XP055155793

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo960619c