Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2785723 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2785723



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 309
09.08.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.10.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.09.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.08.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.08.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
26.08.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
26.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.04.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.04.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.04.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.04.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 67
19.04.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 67
24.03.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
22.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.01.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
22.01.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
22.01.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
22.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.07.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
25.06.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.06.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
25.06.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
05.06.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
19.08.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
30.07.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
28.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
25.06.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
11.04.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
27.06.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 34
06.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
06.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 68