Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2785723


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
11.08.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
21.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
14.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.08.2017  [2017/33]
30.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
16.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.07.2017  [2017/29]
15.06.2017 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
26.05.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.06.2017  [2017/26]
05.05.2017 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  07.06.2017  [2017/23]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
02.09.2016 (Expected) grant published on  05.10.2016  [2016/40]
30.08.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
30.08.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
29.08.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
18.04.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.03.2016 Change - classification published on  27.04.2016  [2016/17]
25.03.2016 Change - classification published on  27.04.2016  [2016/17]
27.01.2016 Amendment by applicant
13.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.06.2015 Change - classification published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
26.06.2015 Change - classification published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
26.06.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
06.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
13.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
05.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
15.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
27.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication