Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791562

EP2791562 - ROTARY VALVE ADAPTER ASSEMBLY WITH PLANETARY GEAR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.08.2016
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.09.2016  [2016/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Big Horn Valve, Inc.
1664 Terra Ave., 5
Sheridan, WY 82801 / US
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / BURGESS, Kevin
1664 Terra Ave. 5
Sheridan, WY 82801 / US
02 / YAKOS, David
3701 Trakker Trail Unit 2A
Bozeman, MT 59718 / US
03 / WALTHALL, Bryan
1417 Gale Court
Bozeman, MT 59718 / US
 [2014/48]
Former [2014/43]01 / BURGESS, Kevin
1664 Terra Ave. 5
Sheridan, WY 82801 / US
02 / YAKOS, David
2014 Gilkerson Dr.
Unit A
Bozeman, MT 59715 / US
03 / WALTHALL, Bryan
2014 Gilkerson Dr.
Unit A
Bozeman, MT 59715 / US
Representative(s)Kador & Partner PartG mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date12853464.128.11.2012
WO2012US66873
Priority number, dateUS20111331073303.12.2011         Original published format: US201113310733
US20121335662823.01.2012         Original published format: US201213356628
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013082167
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791562
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:F16K31/44
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:DREHVENTILADAPTERANORDNUNG MIT PLANETENGETRIEBESYSTEM[2014/43]
English:ROTARY VALVE ADAPTER ASSEMBLY WITH PLANETARY GEAR SYSTEM[2014/43]
French:ENSEMBLE ADAPTATEUR DE VANNE TOURNANTE COMPORTANT UN SYSTÈME DE TRAINS ÉPICYCLOÏDAUX[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase02.07.2014National basic fee paid 
02.07.2014Search fee paid 
02.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
05.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/39]
11.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US2004007008  (BENATAV DROR [IL]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [A]US7325780  (ARAI YUSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *
International search[X]US7325780  (ARAI YUSUKE [JP], et al);
 [Y]US7523917  (ARAI YUSUKE [JP]);
 [A]US2008073606  (LIANTONIO VITO M [US]);
 [A]US2003226995  (BURGOS GLENN D [US])