Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786226

EP2786226 - DYNAMICALLY ENTERING LOW POWER STATES DURING ACTIVE WORKLOADS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Ren
9137 NW Esson Ct.
Portland Oregon 97229 / US
02 / TAI, Tsung-Yuan C.
12709 NW Majestic Sequoia Way
Portland Oregon 97229 / US
03 / TSAI, JR-Shian
6657 NW 165th Avenue
Portland Oregon 97229 / US
04 / FLEMING, Bruce L.
1481 Morning Star Drive
Morgan Hill California 95037 / US
05 / MURALIDHAR, Rajeev D
305 6th Block, 2nd Phase
BSK 3rd Stage
Bangalore, KA 560085 / IN
06 / ERGIN, Mesut A.
15270 NW Nightshade Drive
Portland Oregon 97229 / US
07 / IYER, Prakash N.
12535 NW Lilywood Drive
Portland Oregon 97229 / US
08 / SESHADRI, Harinarayanan
112, Haritha Apartments
301, 11 cross Malleswaram
Bangalore, KA 560003 / IN
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Rummler, Felix
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Rummler, Felix
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date12853783.427.11.2012
WO2012US66656
Priority number, dateIN2011DEL343329.11.2011         Original published format: IN 3433DE2011
[2017/16]
Former [2014/41]IN2011DEL343329.11.2011
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013082030
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786226
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/32
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:DYNAMISCHER EINTRITT IN NIEDRIGLEISTUNGSZUSTÄNDE WÄHREND EINER AKTIVEN ARBEITSLAST[2014/41]
English:DYNAMICALLY ENTERING LOW POWER STATES DURING ACTIVE WORKLOADS[2014/41]
French:PASSAGE DYNAMIQUE À DES ÉTATS DE FAIBLE CONSOMMATION DURANT DES CHARGES DE TRAVAIL ACTIVES[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase09.05.2014National basic fee paid 
09.05.2014Search fee paid 
09.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
25.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.05.2019
23.05.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/42]
27.05.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
02.06.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/42]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.10.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2011085330  (QUALCOMM INC [US]; GARGASH NORMAN S [US]; FRANTZ ANDREW J [US]; SALSBE) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0054]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0066]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0072]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0079]; figure 7 *;
 [XAI]US2003105983  (BRAKMO LAWRENCE SIVERT [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,7-11,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 6,13 [I] 5,12;
 [XI]US2010169684  (JEYASEELAN JAYA L [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,6,8,9,13,15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1-4 * [I] 7,14;
 [XI]US2010169685  (GOUGH ROBERT E [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,8-12,15 * the whole document * [I] 7,14;
 [X]EP1780624  (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9,15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0017]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0023]; figure 5 *
International search[Y]WO2011085330  (QUALCOMM INC.);
 [Y]US8024590  (SONG, JUSTIN ET AL.);
 [A]US2010115314  (SULTENFUSS, ANDREW T.);
 [A]US2010287396  (BARTH, ANDY ET AL.);
 [A]US2007094525  (UGUEN, LAURENT ET AL.)
by applicantWO2011085330
 US2003105983