Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786578

EP2786578 - APPARATUS AND METHOD OF TRANSMITING/RECEIVING BROADCAST DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 25.10.2017  [2017/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / HWANG, Sung-Hee
129 Sansung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
02 / PARK, Kyung-Mo
129 Sansung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
03 / YANG, Hyun-Koo
129 Sansung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
04 / HWANG, Sung-Oh
129 Sansung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 448- 742 / KR
05 / RHYU, Sung-Ryeul
129 Sansung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 448- 742 / KR
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date12853877.430.11.2012
WO2012KR10311
Priority number, dateKR2011012736630.11.2011         Original published format: KR 20110127366
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013081414
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786578
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H03M13/00, H03M13/11, H03M13/15, H03M13/35, H03M13/37, H04L1/00, H04L29/06, H04N21/2383
[2015/45]
Former International [2014/41]H04N7/64, H04N7/26, H03M13/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN/EMPFANGEN VON RUNDFUNKDATEN[2014/41]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD OF TRANSMITING/RECEIVING BROADCAST DATA[2014/41]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION/RÉCEPTION DE DONNÉES DE RADIODIFFUSION[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Search fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
02.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.09.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/43]
Divisional application(s)EP17189357.1
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]US2002146074  (ARIEL MEIR [IL] ET AL) [I] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [XI]  - SHENGJIE ZHAO ET AL, "Optimal Resource Allocation for Wireless Video over CDMA Networks", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MOBILE COMPUTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (200501), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TMC.2005.13, ISSN 1536-1233, pages 56 - 67, XP011123479 [X] 1-3 * section 4 "Channel Coding";; figures 1, 2 * [I] 4-14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMC.2005.13
 [A]  - THOMOS N ET AL, "Wireless Image Transmission Using Turbo Codes and Optimal Unequal Error Protection", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, (200511), vol. 14, no. 11, doi:10.1109/TIP.2005.854482, ISSN 1057-7149, pages 1890 - 1901, XP011140384 [A] 1-14 * section II;; figures 2, 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIP.2005.854482
 [A]  - MARTINI M G ET AL, "ROBUST TRANSMISSION OF MPEG-4 VIDEO: START CODES SUBSTITUTION AND LENGTH FIELD INSERTION ASSISTED UNEQUAL ERROR PROTECTION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE PICTURE CODING SYMPOSIUM, XX, XX, (20010425), pages 155 - 158, XP001150368 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * section 3 "Length field insertion" *
 [X]  - SHERWOOD P G ET AL, "Error protection for progressive image transmission over memoryless and fading channels", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING, ICIP 98, CHICAGO, IL, USA 4-7 OCT. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA, IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19981004), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ICIP.1998.723484, ISBN 978-0-8186-8821-8, pages 324 - 328, XP010308741 [X] 1 * abstract * * section 4 "Unequal Error Protection";; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1998.723484
 [XI]  - JOACHIM HAGENAUER ET AL, "Channel Coding and Transmission Aspects for Wireless Multimedia", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (199910), vol. 87, no. 10, ISSN 0018-9219, XP011044279 [X] 1-3 * abstract * * sections II, III;; figures 1,2 * [I] 4-14
 [XI]  - QUNYING LI ET AL, "Robust SPIHT-Coded Image Transmission over Wireless Channels Using Packetization", 2ND INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS ON IMAGE AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2009, CISP '09, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091017), ISBN 978-1-4244-4129-7, pages 1 - 4, XP031552937 [X] 1-3 * abstract * * Section II.B. "Channel coder";; figure 2 * [I] 4-14
 [I]  - QI QU ET AL, "Source-adaptive FEC/UEP coding for video transport over bursty packet loss 3G UMTS networks: a cross-layer approach", 60TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, VTC2004-FALL, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,, (20040926), vol. 5, doi:10.1109/VETECF.2004.1404642, ISBN 978-0-7803-8521-4, pages 3150 - 3154, XP010787454 [I] 1-3,8-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2004.1404642
International search[A]US2002093937  (MIN-KOO KIM ET AL.);
 [A]US2010241931  (CHOI IN HWAN ET AL.);
 [A]US2011110457  (LAKKIS ISMAIL)