Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790624

EP2790624 - DRY WIPE TO DECREASE FRIZZ AND STATIC AND TO INCREASE SHINE ON HAIR AND AID IN PREVENTION OF REOCCURANCE OF STATIC AND FRIZZ [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[2015/51]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
For all designated states
Salese, Michelle
205 Lexington Blvd Apt. 5
Clark, NJ 07066 / US
For all designated states
Morris, Jolene
117 Ferris Place
Westfield, NJ 07090 / US
For all designated states
Rogers, Chelsea
326 Hazelwood Place
Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SALESE, Michelle
205 Lexington Blvd Apt. 5
Clark, NJ 07066 / US
02 / MORRIS, Jolene
117 Ferris Place
Westfield, NJ 07090 / US
03 / ALI, Chelsea
326 Hazelwood Place
Piscataway, NJ 08854 / US
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Lavoix
Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Tischner, Oliver
Lavoix Munich
Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date12854017.630.11.2012
WO2012US67300
Priority number, dateUS201161565840P01.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161565840 P
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013082430
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790624
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/12, A61K8/31, A61K8/73, A61K8/60, A61K8/34, A61K8/41, A61K8/37, A61Q5/00, A61Q5/12, A61K8/92, A61K8/02
[2015/29]
Former International [2014/43]A61F13/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:TROCKENWISCHTUCH ZUR VERMINDERUNG VON KRÄUSELUNG UND ELEKTROSTATISCHER AUFLADUNG SOWIE ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES GLANZES DER HAARE SOWIE ZUR VERHINDERUNG DES WIEDERAUFTRETENS VON KRÄUSELUNG UND ELEKTROSTATISCHER AUFLADUNG[2014/43]
English:DRY WIPE TO DECREASE FRIZZ AND STATIC AND TO INCREASE SHINE ON HAIR AND AID IN PREVENTION OF REOCCURANCE OF STATIC AND FRIZZ[2014/43]
French:LINGETTE SÈCHE POUR DIMINUER DES FRISOTTIS ET L'ÉLECTRICITÉ STATIQUE ET POUR AUGMENTER LE BRILLANT SUR LES CHEVEUX ET FACILITER LA PRÉVENTION DE LA RÉCURRENCE DE L'ÉLECTRICITÉ STATIQUE ET DES FRISOTTIS[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Search fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
12.05.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.09.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO9955303  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]; ALBACARYS LOURDES DESSUS [US]; MCATEE DAVID MIC) [X] 1,4-7,12-14 * page 3, line 6 - page 3, line 10 * * example 7 * [I] 2,3;
 [XA]US2006039956  (HENSEN HERMANN [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,6,12 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0153] * * paragraph [0155] * * table 3 * [A] 2-5,7,13,14;
 [XA]WO03037292  (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]; HENZEN HERMANN [DE]; LEONARD MARK [GB];) [X] 1,6,12 * page 28, paragraph 1 * * page 31, paragraph 3 * * example 4 * [A] 2-5,7,13,14;
 [XA]EP1371379  (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE]) [X] 1,4,7,12 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0072] * [A] 2,3,5,6,13,14;
 [I]GB2022415  (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [I] 1-7,12-14 * page 1, line 57 - page 1, line 63 *;
 [I]US4149551  (BENJAMIN LAWRENCE ET AL) [I] 1-7,12-14 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 2 *;
 [A]EP0047116  (UNILEVER PLC [GB]; UNILEVER NV [NL]) [A] 1-7,12-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9921532  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-7,12-14 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2003022572  (GOTT ET AL.);
 [Y]US2004092185  (GRAFE ET AL.);
 [Y]US6395701  (CONNOR ET AL.);
 [Y]US6753063  (PUNG ET AL.);
 [A]EP1405634  (SIMON ET AL.)
by applicantWO9955303
 US2006039956
 WO03037292
 EP1371379
 GB2022415
 US4149551