Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786705

EP2786705 - SHOE INSOLE SENSOR FOR WALK DIAGNOSIS AND SHOE INSOLE FLEXIBLE BOARD COMBINED WITH THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/41]SHOE INSOLE SENSOR FOR DIAGNOSING GAIT, AND SHOE INSOLE SUBSTRATE CONNECTED THERETO
[2016/47]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lee, Jin-Wook
Suite 606, Poongrim 2Cha Apt.
104 Samseong-dong
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 135-090 / KR
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date12854118.215.11.2012
[2017/14]
WO2012KR09669
Priority number, dateKR2011012551629.11.2011         Original published format: KR 20110125516
[2014/41]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013081320
Date:06.06.2013
Language:KO
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786705
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2786705
Date:05.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/103, A61B5/11, A43B3/00, A61B5/00
[2015/33]
Former International [2014/41]A61B5/103, A61B5/11
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHUHEINLEGESOHLENSENSOR FÜR GEHDIAGNOSE UND DAMIT KOMBINIERTE FLEXIBLE SCHUHEINLEGESOHLENPLATTE[2016/47]
English:SHOE INSOLE SENSOR FOR WALK DIAGNOSIS AND SHOE INSOLE FLEXIBLE BOARD COMBINED WITH THE SAME[2016/47]
French:CAPTEUR DE SEMELLE INTÉRIEURE POUR UN DIAGNOSTIC DE LA DÉMARCHE ET PLANCHE FLEXIBLE DE SEMELLE INTÉRIEURE DE CHAUSSURE COMBINÉE AVEC CELUI-CI[2016/47]
Former [2014/41]SCHUHEINLEGESOHLENSENSOR ZUR DIAGNOSE DER GANGART UND DARAN ANGESCHLOSSENE SCHUHEINLEGESOHLENUNTERLAGE
Former [2014/41]SHOE INSOLE SENSOR FOR DIAGNOSING GAIT, AND SHOE INSOLE SUBSTRATE CONNECTED THERETO
Former [2014/41]CAPTEUR DE SEMELLE INTÉRIEURE DE CHAUSSURE POUR UN DIAGNOSTIC DE LA DÉMARCHE ET SUBSTRAT DE SEMELLE INTÉRIEURE DE CHAUSSURE CONNECTÉ À CELUI-CI
Entry into regional phase28.05.2014Translation filed 
28.05.2014National basic fee paid 
28.05.2014Search fee paid 
28.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
27.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2017Fee for grant paid
27.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.10.2016
Opposition(s)08.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
05.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.11.2012
AT05.04.2017
CY05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
IE15.11.2017
LU15.11.2017
MT15.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU15.11.2012
AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
IE15.11.2017
LU15.11.2017
MT15.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/50]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
IE15.11.2017
LU15.11.2017
MT15.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/45]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
IE15.11.2017
LU15.11.2017
MT15.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/43]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
LU15.11.2017
MT15.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/41]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
LU15.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/33]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/25]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
IT05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT05.04.2017
CZ05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT05.04.2017
DK05.04.2017
EE05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
PL05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SE05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT05.04.2017
ES05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
NL05.04.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL05.04.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US7426873  (KHOLWADWALA DEEPESH K [US] ET AL) [A] 1-16 * figure - *;
 [A]KR20110124964  (LEE JIN WOOK [KR]) [A] 1-16 * figure - *;
 [A]DE102010049154  (MOTICON GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * figure - *;
 [A]US2003097878  (FARRINGDON JONATHAN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-16 * figure - *
International search[A]KR20110124964  (LEE, JIN WOOK);
 [A]US2003097878  (JONATHAN FARRINGDON. ET AL.);
 [A]US2010201650  (JAE S.SON);
 [A]KR100702613B  (AISON CO.,LTD)