Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786973

EP2786973 - METHOD FOR CALCINING BLENDING MATERIAL WITH HIGH ACTIVITY BY FEEDING OUTSIDE KILN HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/41]METHOD FOR CALCINING BLENDING MATERIAL WITH HIGH ACTIVITY BY FEEDING OUTSIDE KILN HEAD AND EQUIPMENT THEREOF
[2018/33]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Luzhou Landlong Cement Co. Ltd.
Industrial and Mining Region of Fuji Town
Lu County
Luzhou
Sichuan 646127 / CN
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / QI, Zhengliang
Room 20H
International Park Building
No.160 of Tianmushan Road
Xihu District
Hangzhou Zhejiang 310012 / CN
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Ganghoferstraße 68 B
80339 München / DE
[2019/06]
Former [2014/41]Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Straße 98
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date12854281.822.05.2012
[2019/06]
WO2012CN75900
Priority number, dateCN20111038525928.11.2011         Original published format: CN201110385259
[2014/41]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013078839
Date:06.06.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786973
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2786973
Date:06.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:C04B7/43, C04B7/24, C04B7/28, C04B7/44, C04B7/30
[2015/32]
Former International [2014/41]C04B7/43, C04B7/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM KALZINIEREN VON MISCHMATERIAL MIT HOHER AKTIVITÄT DURCH ZUFÜHREN AUSSERHALB DES BRENNOFENKOPFS[2018/33]
English:METHOD FOR CALCINING BLENDING MATERIAL WITH HIGH ACTIVITY BY FEEDING OUTSIDE KILN HEAD[2018/33]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CALCINATION D'UN MATÉRIAU DE MÉLANGE À ACTIVITÉ ÉLEVÉE PAR ALIMENTATION EN DEHORS D'UNE TÊTE DE FOUR[2018/33]
Former [2014/41]VERFAHREN ZUM KALZINIEREN VON MISCHMATERIAL MIT HOHER AKTIVITÄT DURCH ZUFÜHREN AUSSERHALB DES BRENNOFENKOPFS UND AUSRÜSTUNG DAFÜR
Former [2014/41]METHOD FOR CALCINING BLENDING MATERIAL WITH HIGH ACTIVITY BY FEEDING OUTSIDE KILN HEAD AND EQUIPMENT THEREOF
Former [2014/41]PROCÉDÉ DE CALCINATION D'UN MATÉRIAU DE MÉLANGE À ACTIVITÉ ÉLEVÉE PAR ALIMENTATION EN DEHORS D'UNE TÊTE DE FOUR ET ÉQUIPEMENT ASSOCIÉ
Entry into regional phase23.06.2014Translation filed 
23.06.2014National basic fee paid 
23.06.2014Search fee paid 
23.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
03.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2018Fee for grant paid
18.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
IT06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
[2019/46]
Former [2019/39]FI06.02.2019
HR06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
LV06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
RS06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
IS06.06.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
BG06.05.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
GR07.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NL06.02.2019
SE06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.02.2019
LT06.02.2019
NO06.05.2019
PT06.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]JPH08268740  (CHICHIBU ONODA CEMENT CORP) [X] 1-3,5-11 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 * [I] 4;
 [X]CN102070308  (CITIC HEAVY IND CO LTD, et al) [X] 9 * the whole document *
International search[X]CN102070308  (CITIC HEAVY IND CO LTD, et al);
 [Y]CN102211886  (BEICHUAN SIXING CEMENT CO LTD);
 [A]CN1370750  (TIANJIN DESIGN INST OF CEMENT [CN]);
 [A]CN1436745  (LIU YANHONG [CN]);
 [A]CN1236748  (PAN GUANGHUA [CN])
ExaminationCN102173607
 JP2007331976
by applicantCN101407382
 CN1072159
 CN1057821
 CN1546410
 CN1124724