Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2787340


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.01.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.11.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.10.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.05.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.03.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.02.2018 First examination report
29.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.12.2015 Amendment by applicant
27.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.07.2015 Change - representative
03.07.2015 Change - classification published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
03.07.2015 Change - classification published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
03.07.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
06.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
28.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
05.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
25.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
27.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.05.2014 Amendment by applicant
14.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
19.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication