Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787340

EP2787340 - CHEMICAL SENSOR, CHEMICAL SENSOR MODULE, CHEMICAL SUBSTANCE DETECTOR AND METHOD FOR DETECTING CHEMICAL SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.01.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2014/41]
Inventor(s)01 / MORIYA, Yusuke
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / MATSUZAWA, Nobuyuki
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / MAEDA, Kensaku
c/o SONY CORPORATION
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Horner, David Richard
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date12854364.216.11.2012
WO2012JP07370
Priority number, dateJP2011026271430.11.2011         Original published format: JP 2011262714
[2014/41]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013080473
Date:06.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787340
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/64, G01J3/44
[2015/32]
Former International [2014/41]G01N21/64
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:CHEMISCHER SENSOR, MODUL EINES CHEMISCHEN SENSORS, DETEKTOR FÜR CHEMISCHE SUBSTANZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION EINER CHEMISCHEN SUBSTANZ[2014/41]
English:CHEMICAL SENSOR, CHEMICAL SENSOR MODULE, CHEMICAL SUBSTANCE DETECTOR AND METHOD FOR DETECTING CHEMICAL SUBSTANCE[2014/41]
French:CAPTEUR CHIMIQUE, MODULE À CAPTEUR CHIMIQUE, DÉTECTEUR DE SUBSTANCE CHIMIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'UNE SUBSTANCE CHIMIQUE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase14.05.2014Translation filed 
21.06.2014National basic fee paid 
21.06.2014Search fee paid 
21.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
21.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP2221606  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0067] - [0189]; figure - *;
 [Y]JP2004205340  (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0117]; figure - *;
 [Y]US7538335  (LEARD FRANCIS LAWRENCE [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 48 - column 6, line 10; figure - *;
 [Y]JP2003313506  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP; DAINIPPON TORYO KK) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0032] *
International search[Y]JP2004205340  (CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2003313506  (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP.);
 [Y]JP2002350349  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2003518924  (THE PUBLIC HEALTH RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK, INC.);
 [Y]JP2002350348  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2002202303