Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790065

EP2790065 - CARTRIDGE ATTACHABLE TO AND DETACHABLE FROM ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS MAIN BODY, METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING PHOTOSENSITIVE DRUM DRIVE TRANSMISSION DEVICE, AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KAWAKAMI, Takuya
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
02 / KOMATSU, Noriyuki
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
03 / SHIRAKATA, Sho
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
04 / KOISHI, Isao
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date12854694.206.12.2012
WO2012JP82271
Priority number, dateJP2011026698906.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011266989
JP2012022810815.10.2012         Original published format: JP 2012228108
JP2012024277802.11.2012         Original published format: JP 2012242778
[2014/42]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013085073
Date:13.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790065
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:G03G21/18, G03G21/16
[2015/31]
Former International [2014/42]G03G21/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:KARTUSCHE ZUR ANBRINGUNG AM UND ABLÖSUNG VOM HAUPTKÖRPER EINER ELEKTROPHOTOGRAPHISCHEN BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINER LICHTEMPFINDLICHEN TROMMELANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTROPHOTOGRAPHISCHE BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2014/42]
English:CARTRIDGE ATTACHABLE TO AND DETACHABLE FROM ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS MAIN BODY, METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING PHOTOSENSITIVE DRUM DRIVE TRANSMISSION DEVICE, AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS[2014/42]
French:CARTOUCHE ATTACHABLE À ET DÉTACHABLE D'UN CORPS PRINCIPAL D'APPAREIL FORMANT IMAGE ÉLECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE, PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE COMMANDE DE TAMBOUR PHOTOSENSIBLE ET APPAREIL FORMANT IMAGE ÉLECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase03.06.2014Translation filed 
07.07.2014National basic fee paid 
07.07.2014Search fee paid 
07.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
21.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2009317129  (ABE DAISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9-14,16,17,19,26-28 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8,20-23 [I] 15,18,29;
 [XYI]WO2008081966  (CANON KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9-14,16,17,19,24-28 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8,20-23 [I] 15,18,29;
 [Y]US4065941  (AOKI SADASHIRO) [Y] 7,8,20-23 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP4498407B  (CANON INC.);
 [A]JP4948382B  (CANON INC.);
 [A]JP2011145670  (CANON KK);
 [A]JP2011095604  (CANON KK);
 [A]JP2006072160  (RICOH KK);
 [A]JP2004045603  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC);
 [A]JP2002048148  (CANON KK)
by applicantJP4498407B