Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2790065


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
27.05.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.03.2019 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.11.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.11.2018 First examination report
12.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.01.2016 Amendment by applicant
16.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.06.2015 Change - classification published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
26.06.2015 Change - classification published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
26.06.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
13.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
16.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
12.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
25.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
04.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication