Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789079

EP2789079 - ELECTRIC DRIVE DEVICE FOR MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.02.2019  [2019/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bae Systems Hägglunds Aktiebolag
891 82 Örnsköldsvik / SE
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / KARLSSON, Pontus
Alpvägen 2a
S-168 65 Bromma / SE
02 / PRINSBACK, Oskar
Krukmakarvägen 4
S-891 77 Järved / SE
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Zacco Sweden AB
Valhallavägen 117
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2014/42]Kajlert, Erik Göran
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date12854710.623.11.2012
WO2012SE51298
Priority number, dateSE2011005116206.12.2011         Original published format: SE 1151162
[2014/42]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013085452
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789079
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02K5/22, B60K7/00
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE[2014/42]
English:ELECTRIC DRIVE DEVICE FOR MOTOR VEHICLE[2014/42]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE POUR VÉHICULE À MOTEUR[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase04.06.2014National basic fee paid 
04.06.2014Search fee paid 
04.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
15.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/08]
11.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/08]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0190602  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,12,13 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE102008040873  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,13 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2005285457  (TSUTSUI TAKAHIRO [JP] ET AL) [A] 10,11 * figures 3,11 *;
 [A]DE3936928  (MARTIN UMWELT & ENERGIETECH [DE]) [A] 7 * abstract *
International search[X]WO2011065179  (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD ET AL);
 [X]DE102007042456  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN);
 [X]US2011285220  (SONOHARA TOMOKA ET AL);
 [A]US5998896  (EARLY JOHN ET AL)