Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786343

EP2786343 - DIGITAL MAKEUP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Digital Makeup Ltd
7 Beit Hillel Street
6701707 Tel Aviv / IL
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Digital Makeup Ltd.
7 Beit Hillel Street
67017 Tel Aviv / IL
Inventor(s)01 / GUISSIN, Rami
18 Hatzouk Street
4029300 Beit Yanai / IL
02 / LAVI, Eitan
54 Harav Kook Street
3842754 Hadera / IL
03 / LIFCHITZ, Guy
6 Tel Hai Street
4291000 Avihail / IL
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Becker Kurig Straus
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date12854815.304.12.2012
WO2012IL50504
Priority number, dateIL2011021675204.12.2011         Original published format: IL 21675211
IL2012021928619.04.2012         Original published format: IL 21928612
US201261706407P27.09.2012         Original published format: US 201261706407 P
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013084233
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786343
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IL13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06T5/00
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:DIGITALES MAKEUP[2014/41]
English:DIGITAL MAKEUP[2014/41]
French:MAQUILLAGE NUMÉRIQUE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2014National basic fee paid 
01.08.2014Search fee paid 
01.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
11.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.10.2018
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee
01.08.2014Request for further processing filed
01.08.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.08.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201504   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2016
31.12.201605   M06   Fee paid on   26.05.2017
31.12.201706   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5467404  (VUYLSTEKE PIETER P [BE] ET AL) [X] 1,3-7,12,16-18 * figures 4a,4b,4d,4e,5a,5b,6a,6b * * abstract * [I] 2,8-11,13-15;
 [XI]US4446484  (POWELL PHILIP G [GB]) [X] 1,3-7,12,16-18 * abstract * * figures 7, 8, 13, 14, 20, 21, 28-30, 36 * [I] 2,8-11,13-15;
 [XI]WO2010084431  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; NXP BV [NL]; DA ROCHA LEITAO JORG) [X] 1,3-7,12,16-18 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * [I] 2,8-11,13-15;
 [Y]US2005226470  (KONDO KENJI [JP] ET AL) [Y] 1,16,18 * abstract * * figure 5 *;
 [A]EP1441309  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC [JP]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - 56-93, "MULTIRATE DIGITAL FILTERS, FILTER BANKS, POLYPHASE NETWORKS, AND APPLICATIONS: A TUTORIAL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (19900101), vol. 78, no. 1, doi:10.1109/5.52200, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 56 - 93, XP000125845 [Y] 1,16,18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/5.52200
 [A]  - HASAN DEMIREL ET AL, "Discrete Wavelet Transform-Based Satellite Image Resolution Enhancement", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20110601), vol. 49, no. 6, doi:10.1109/TGRS.2010.2100401, ISSN 0196-2892, pages 1997 - 2004, XP011323288 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TGRS.2010.2100401
 [A]  - JIANBING SHEN ET AL, "Detail-preserving exposure fusion using subband architecture", THE VISUAL COMPUTER ; INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER GRAPHICS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20110913), vol. 28, no. 5, doi:10.1007/S00371-011-0642-3, ISSN 1432-2315, pages 463 - 473, XP035043299 [A] 1-18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00371-011-0642-3
International search[A]EP1139651  ;
 [A]US2009016639  ;
 [A]US5717789  ;
 [A]US7612794  ;
 [A]WO2011055164  ;
 [A]US2009238486