Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789947

EP2789947 - REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.04.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toshiba Lifestyle Products & Services Corporation
2-9, Suehiro-cho
Ome-shi, Tokyo 198-8710 / JP
[2016/41]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
For all designated states
Toshiba Lifestyle Products & Services Corporation
2-9, Suehiro-cho
Ome-shi, Tokyo 198-8710 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ABE, Tokimi
c/o Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
02 / SAEKI, Tomoyasu
c/o Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
03 / ISHIBASHI, Ikuo
c/o Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
04 / OIKAWA, Makoto
c/o Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
05 / YOSHIDA, Takaaki
c/o Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
06 / KOMABA, Takashi
c/o Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
07 / ABE, Masanori
c/o Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2017/32]
Former [2014/42]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date12854870.803.12.2012
[2017/32]
WO2012JP81282
Priority number, dateJP2011026713906.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011267139
[2014/42]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013084844
Date:13.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789947
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2789947
Date:09.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:F25D23/02
[2015/31]
Former International [2014/42]F25D23/06, F25D23/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:KÜHLSCHRANK[2014/42]
English:REFRIGERATOR[2014/42]
French:RÉFRIGÉRATEUR[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase16.06.2014Translation filed 
16.06.2014National basic fee paid 
16.06.2014Search fee paid 
16.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
20.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2017Fee for grant paid
27.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.04.2016
Opposition(s)11.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.12.2012
AT09.08.2017
CY09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IE03.12.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
IS09.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU03.12.2012
AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IE03.12.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
IS09.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2019/30]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
MC09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IE03.12.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
IS09.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/52]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IE03.12.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
IS09.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
Former [2018/50]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IE03.12.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
IS09.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/45]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IE03.12.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
LU03.12.2017
MT03.12.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SI09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/24]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
EE09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
IT09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RO09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
SK09.08.2017
SM09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT09.08.2017
CZ09.08.2017
DK09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
LV09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT09.08.2017
ES09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
PL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
BG09.11.2017
NO09.11.2017
GR10.11.2017
IS09.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT09.08.2017
FI09.08.2017
HR09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
RS09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
SE09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI09.08.2017
LT09.08.2017
NL09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT09.08.2017
NO09.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]JP2004340194  (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0022] - [0029]; figure 3 * [Y] 3;
 [X]FR1083712  (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE) [X] 1,2,4,5 * pages 2,3,4,5; figures 3,5,7 *;
 [X]JP2007113748  (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraphs [0069] - [0087]; figure 7 *;
 [X]EP0672876  (AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,5 * pages 2,3; figure 3 *;
 [X]WO2011058678  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]; TOSHIBA CONSUMER ELECT HOLDING [JP]; TOSHIBA HOME APP) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0023] - [0025]; figure 4 *;
 [Y]US2005235682  (HIRAI CHIE [JP] ET AL) [Y] 3 * figure 2 *;
 [A]JP2011122739  (TOSHIBA CORP; TOSHIBA CONSUMER ELECT HOLDING; TOSHIBA HOME APPLIANCES) [A] 3 * paragraph [0024]; figure 8 *;
 [A]DE9204365U  (LIEBHERR-HAUSGERÄTE GMBH) [A] 1,2,4,5 * page 6; figure 1 *
International search[X]JPS5998287U  (HITACHI, LTD.);
 [X]JPS5980685U  (HITACHI, LTD.);
 [X]JPS56141989U  (HITACHI, LTD.);
 [X]JP2004340194  (TOSHIBA CORP.);
 [Y]WO2011058678  (TOSHIBA CORP.);
 [A]JP2011122739  (TOSHIBA CORP.);
 [A]JP2005331000  (HITACHI HOME & LIFE SOLUTION, INC.)
ExaminationJP2007240021