Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2788759

EP2788759 - METHODS AND USES FOR DIAGNOSIS OF RENAL INJURY AND RENAL FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/42]METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND PROGNOSIS OF RENAL INJURY AND RENAL FAILURE
[2018/11]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HR, IS, LV, RS
published on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Astute Medical, Inc.
Blg 2 R. 645 3550 General Atomics Court
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERBERG, Joseph
470 Delage Court
Encinitas, CA 92024 / US
02 / GRAY, Jeff
417 Bay Meadows Way
Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US
03 / MCPHERSON, Paul
1449 Elva Court
Encinitas, CA 92024 / US
04 / NAKAMURA, Kevin
2409 Newcastle Avenue
Cardiff By The Sea, CA 92007 / US
05 / KAMPF, James, Patrick
5882 Gablewood Way
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Wilding, James Roger , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/08]Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Ganghoferstraße 68 B
80339 München / DE
Former [2014/42]Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Straße 98
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date12854991.207.12.2012
[2019/08]
WO2012US68498
Priority number, dateUS201161568447P08.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161568447 P
US201261593561P01.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261593561 P
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013086359
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2788759
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2788759
Date:20.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68
[2018/11]
Former International [2014/42]G01N33/53
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNGEN ZUR DIAGNOSE VON NIERENVERLETZUNGEN UND NIERENINSUFFIZIENZ[2018/11]
English:METHODS AND USES FOR DIAGNOSIS OF RENAL INJURY AND RENAL FAILURE[2018/11]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET UTILISATIONS PERMETTANT DE DIAGNOSTIQUER UNE LÉSION DES REINS ET UNE INSUFFISANCE RÉNALE[2018/11]
Former [2014/42]VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND PROGNOSE VON NIERENVERLETZUNGEN UND NIERENINSUFFIZIENZ
Former [2014/42]METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND PROGNOSIS OF RENAL INJURY AND RENAL FAILURE
Former [2014/42]PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT DE DIAGNOSTIQUER ET DE PRONOSTIQUER UNE LÉSION DES REINS ET UNE INSUFFISANCE RÉNALE
Entry into regional phase07.07.2014National basic fee paid 
07.07.2014Search fee paid 
07.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
27.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.07.2018Fee for grant paid
30.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19151748.1  / EP3540440
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.09.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI20.02.2019
HR20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
RS20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
[2019/39]
Former [2019/38]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
NO20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
NO20.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
NO20.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2011097539  (ASTUTE MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 13-15 * the whole document, in particular paragraphs [0024], [0048], [0075], [0079], [0089]-[0101]; claims 1-108; tables 1, 2, 4-6, 8-12 * [I] 1-12;
 [X]WO2008067065  (SRIVASTAVA SHIV [US], et al) [X] 14 * the whole document, in particular claims 14-16 *;
 [A]  - NEJAT MARYAM ET AL, "Urinary cystatin C is diagnostic of acute kidney injury and sepsis, and predicts mortality in the intensive care unit", CRITICAL CARE, (20100512), vol. 14, no. 3, doi:10.1186/CC9014, ISSN 1364-8535, page R85, XP021085463 [A] 1-15 * the whole document, in particular abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/cc9014
 [A]  - RAJIT K BASU ET AL, "Identification of candidate serum biomarkers for severe septic shock-associated kidney injury via microarray", CRITICAL CARE, (20111118), vol. 15, no. 6, doi:10.1186/CC10554, ISSN 1364-8535, page R273, XP021112690 [A] 1-15 * the whole document, in particular abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/cc10554
 [A]  - LONG-XIANG SU ET AL, "Diagnostic value of urine sTREM-1 for sepsis and relevant acute kidney injuries: a prospective study", CRITICAL CARE, (20111024), vol. 15, no. 5, doi:10.1186/CC10508, ISSN 1364-8535, page R250, XP021117563 [A] 1-15 * the whole document, in particular abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/cc10508
 [A]  - SEAN M BAGSHAW ET AL, "Urinary biomarkers in septic acute kidney injury", INTENSIVE CARE MEDICINE, (20070509), vol. 33, no. 7, doi:10.1007/S00134-007-0656-5, ISSN 1432-1238, pages 1285 - 1296, XP019536303 [A] 1-15 * the whole document, in particular abstract; tables *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00134-007-0656-5
 [X]  - LÓPEZ-BERMEJO ABEL ET AL, "Generation of anti-insulin-like growth factor-binding protein-related protein 1 (IGFBP-rP1/MAC25) monoclonal antibodies and immunoassay: quantification of IGFBP-rP1 in human serum and distribution in human fluids and tissues", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (20030701), vol. 88, no. 7, doi:10.1210/JC.2002-021315, ISSN 0021-972X, pages 3401 - 3408, XP002575877 [X] 14 * the whole document, in particular title; abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/jc.2002-021315
International search[X]WO2011075744  (ASTUTE MEDICAL INC [US], et al);
 [A]US2011195429  (ANDERBERG JOSEPH [US], et al);
 [A]WO2011017614  (ASTUTE MEDICAL INC [US], et al)
by applicantWO2011097539
 WO2011075744
 US6143576
 US6113855
 US6019944
 US5985579
 US5947124
 US5939272
 US5922615
 US5885527
 US5851776
 US5824799
 US5679526
 US5525524
 US5480792
 US5631171
 US5955377
 US5571698
 US6057098
    - BONE et al., "American College of Chest Physicians and the American Society of Critical Care Medicine", Chest, (19920000), vol. 101, pages 1644 - 1653
    - LLEWELYN; COHEN, Int. Care Med., (20010000), vol. 27, pages S10 - S32
    - JAIMES et al., Int. Care Med, (20030626), vol. 29, pages 1368 - 1371
    - ZARJOU; AGARWAL, J. Am. Soc. Nephrot., (20110000), vol. 22, pages 999 - 1006
    - RONCO, Clin. J. Am. Soc. Nephrol., (20080000), vol. 3, pages 531 - 544
    - BASU et al., "Identification of candidate serum biomarkers for severe septic shock-associated kidney injury via microarray", Critical Care, (20110000), vol. 15, no. 273, pages 1 - 11
    - BAGSHAW et al., "Urinary biomarkers in septic acute kidney injury", Intensive Care Med., (20070000), vol. 33, doi:doi:10.1007/s00134-007-0656-5, pages 1285 - 1296, XP019536303

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00134-007-0656-5
    - Harrison's Principles of Internal Medicine, McGraw Hill, pages 1741 - 1830
    - Current Medical Diagnosis & Treatment, McGraw Hill, (20080000), pages 785 - 815
    - "Chapter 222", Mark H. And Robert Berkow, Merck Manual. 17th ed.
    - PRAUGHT; SHLIPAK, Curr Opin Nephrol Hypertens, (20050000), vol. 14, pages 265 - 270
    - CHERTOW et al., JAm Soc Nephrol, (20050000), vol. 16, pages 3365 - 3370
    - LASSNIGG, JAm Soc Nephrol, (20040000), vol. 15, pages 1597 - 1605
    - BELLOMO et al., Crit Care, (20040000), vol. 8, no. 4, pages R204 - R212
    - KELLUM, Crit. Care Med., (20080000), vol. 36, pages 141 - 145
    - RICCI et al., Kidney Int., (20080000), vol. 73, pages 538 - 546
    - MEHTA et al., Crit. Care, (20070000), vol. 11, page R31
    - MCCOLLOUGH et al., Rev Cardiovasc Med, (20060000), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 177 - 197
    - WILSON, J. Immunol. Methods, (19940000), vol. 175, pages 267 - 273
    - YARMUSH, J. Biochem. Biophys. Methods, (19920000), vol. 25, pages 85 - 97
    - WARD et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546
    - VAN ERP et al., J. Immunoassay, (19910000), vol. 12, pages 425 - 443
    - NELSON; GRISWOLD, Comput. Methods Programs Biomed., (19880000), vol. 27, pages 65 - 68
    - CWIRLA et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 6378 - 6382
    - DEVLIN et al., Science, (19900000), vol. 249, pages 404 - 406
    - SCOTT; SMITH, Science, (19900000), vol. 249, pages 386 - 388
    - FISCHER, Intensive Care Med., (20030000), vol. 29, pages 1043 - 1051
    - BAGSHAW, Nephrol. Dial. Transplant., (20080000), vol. 23, pages 1203 - 1210
    - HANLEY, J. A.; MCNEIL, B.J., "The meaning and use of the area under a receiver operating characteristic (ROC) curve", Radiology, (19820000), vol. 143, pages 29 - 36, XP002378736