Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790463

EP2790463 - CLOTH-LIKE HEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.08.2016
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
2 Takara-cho
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd
2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MIURA, Hiroaki
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
02 / SUNDA, Takashi
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
03 / FUKUYAMA, Yasuhiro
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
 [2015/40]
Former [2014/42]01 / MIURA, Hiroaki
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
02 / SUNDA, Takashi
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
03 / FUKUYAMA, Yasuhiro
c/o NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD.
Intellectual Property Department
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
Representative(s)Osha Liang
2, rue de la Paix
75002 Paris / FR
[2015/40]
Former [2014/42]Osha Liang SARL
32, avenue de l'Opéra
75002 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date12855009.212.11.2012
[2015/40]
WO2012JP79278
Priority number, dateJP2011026963609.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011269636
[2014/42]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013084668
Date:13.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790463
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2790463
Date:30.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:H05B3/14, H05B3/34, H05B3/36, D01F8/04, D04B1/14
[2015/22]
Former International [2014/42]H05B3/10, D01F8/04, D04B1/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HEIZELEMENT AUS EINEM TEXTILSTOFF[2014/42]
English:CLOTH-LIKE HEATER[2014/42]
French:ÉLÉMENT CHAUFFANT DU TYPE TISSU[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014Translation filed 
24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Search fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
22.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.08.2015Fee for grant paid
24.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.07.2015
Opposition(s)01.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.11.2012
AL30.09.2015
AT30.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
BG30.09.2015
CY30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
MK30.09.2015
MT30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
SM30.09.2015
TR30.09.2015
IE12.11.2015
LU12.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU12.11.2012
AT30.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
BG30.09.2015
CY30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
MK30.09.2015
MT30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
SM30.09.2015
TR30.09.2015
IE12.11.2015
LU12.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2018/31]HU12.11.2012
AT30.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
BG30.09.2015
CY30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
MK30.09.2015
MT30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
SM30.09.2015
IE12.11.2015
LU12.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2017/39]HU12.11.2012
AT30.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
BG30.09.2015
CY30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
MT30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
SM30.09.2015
IE12.11.2015
LU12.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2017/03]AT30.09.2015
BE30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
IE12.11.2015
LU12.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/49]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SI30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
IE12.11.2015
LU12.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/45]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
IE12.11.2015
LU12.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/39]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
DK30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
LU12.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/34]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
LU12.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/31]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
LU12.11.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/28]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
MC30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT30.09.2015
CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
PL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
PT01.02.2016
Former [2016/23]CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
RO30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
SK30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
Former [2016/22]CZ30.09.2015
EE30.09.2015
ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NL30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
IS30.01.2016
Former [2016/21]ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
IT30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
Former [2016/20]ES30.09.2015
FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
Former [2016/10]FI30.09.2015
HR30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
RS30.09.2015
SE30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI30.09.2015
LT30.09.2015
LV30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
GR31.12.2015
Former [2016/08]LT30.09.2015
NO30.12.2015
Former [2016/07]LT30.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]US2010154918  (LI CHEN-LIANG [TW] ET AL) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0022] - [0026]; figures 1,2 *;
 [AD]JP2010144312  (BOSHOKU SANGYO SOGO KENKYUSHO) [AD] 1-9;
 [A]US2005263519  (MICHELMANN JOCHEN [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0019] - [0026]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO0188935  (PERATECH LTD [GB]; WOOL RES ORG NEW ZEALAND INC [NZ]; LUSSEY DAVID [GB) [A] 1-9 * page 10, line 2 - page 11, line 2 * * page 13, line 9 - page 14, line 3; figure 4 *
International search[A]JP2010144312  (TAIWAN TEXTILE RESEARCH INSTITUTE);
 [A]JPS59180393U  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.);
 [A]JPS6248351B  (TDK CORP.);
 [A]JPS5667189  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD.);
 [A]JPH08205968  (BEAM KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA);
 [A]JP2011000945  (TOYOTA BOSHOKU CORP.)
by applicantJP2010144312