Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789580

EP2789580 - PHOTOCATALYST, HYDROGEN GENERATION DEVICE, AND ENERGY SYSTEM CONTAINING NIOBIUM NITRIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/42]NIOBIUM NITRIDE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, NIOBIUM NITRIDE-CONTAINING FILM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, SEMICONDUCTOR, SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, PHOTOCATALYST, HYDROGEN GENERATION DEVICE, AND ENERGY SYSTEM
[2017/17]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP
[2017/34]
Former [2015/14]For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd.
7 OBP Panasonic Tower
1-61, Shiromi 2-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SUZUKI, Takahiro
c/o Panasonic Corporation
IP Center, IP development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower
2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
02 / NOMURA, Takaiki
c/o Panasonic Corporation
IP Center, IP development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower
2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
03 / KUROHA, Tomohiro
c/o Panasonic Corporation
IP Center, IP development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower
2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
04 / MIYATA, Nobuhiro
c/o Panasonic Corporation
IP Center, IP development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower
2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
05 / TAMURA, Satoru
c/o Panasonic Corporation
IP Center, IP development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower
2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 5406207 / JP
06 / TOKUHIRO, Kenichi
c/o Panasonic Corporation
IP Center, IP development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower
2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
07 / HATO, Kazuhito
c/o Panasonic Corporation
IP Center, IP development Group
7F OBP Panasonic Tower
2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku
Osaka 540-6207 / JP
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[2017/34]
Former [2014/42]Unland, Jochen Hermann
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date12855430.028.11.2012
[2017/34]
WO2012JP07639
Priority number, dateJP2011026765907.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011267659
JP2011026766007.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011267660
JP2012003392720.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012033927
[2014/42]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013084447
Date:13.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789580
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2789580
Date:23.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:C01B3/04, B01J27/24, B01J35/02, C01B21/06
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:PHOTOKATALYSATOR, WASSERSTOFFERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ENERGIESYSTEM MIT NIOBIUMNITRID[2017/17]
English:PHOTOCATALYST, HYDROGEN GENERATION DEVICE, AND ENERGY SYSTEM CONTAINING NIOBIUM NITRIDE[2017/17]
French:PHOTOCATALYSEUR, DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'HYDROGÈNE ET SYSTÈME D'ÉNERGIE CONTENTANT LE NITRURE DE NIOBIUM[2017/17]
Former [2014/42]NIOBNITRID UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, NIOBNITRIDHALTIGE BESCHICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, HALBLEITER, HALBLEITERVORRICHTUNG, PHOTOKATALYSATOR, WASSERSTOFFERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ENERGIESYSTEM
Former [2014/42]NIOBIUM NITRIDE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, NIOBIUM NITRIDE-CONTAINING FILM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, SEMICONDUCTOR, SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, PHOTOCATALYST, HYDROGEN GENERATION DEVICE, AND ENERGY SYSTEM
Former [2014/42]NITRURE DE NIOBIUM ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, FILM CONTENANT DU NITRURE DE NIOBIUM ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS, PHOTOCATALYSEUR, DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'HYDROGÈNE ET SYSTÈME D'ÉNERGIE
Entry into regional phase05.08.2013Translation filed 
07.07.2014National basic fee paid 
07.07.2014Search fee paid 
07.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
19.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.2017Fee for grant paid
10.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.04.2017
Opposition(s)24.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.11.2012
AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
MC23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
SI23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
SM23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
GB28.11.2017
IE28.11.2017
LU28.11.2017
MT28.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/50]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
MC23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
SI23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
SM23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
GB28.11.2017
IE28.11.2017
LU28.11.2017
MT28.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/49]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
MC23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
SI23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
SM23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IE28.11.2017
LU28.11.2017
MT28.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
FR30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/45]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
MC23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
SI23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
SM23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IE28.11.2017
LU28.11.2017
MT28.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
MC23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
SI23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
SM23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
LU28.11.2017
MT28.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
MC23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
SI23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
SM23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
LU28.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/33]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
MC23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
SM23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/24]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
EE23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
IT23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RO23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
SK23.08.2017
SM23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT23.08.2017
CZ23.08.2017
DK23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
LV23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT23.08.2017
ES23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
PL23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
BG23.11.2017
NO23.11.2017
GR24.11.2017
IS23.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT23.08.2017
FI23.08.2017
HR23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
RS23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
NO23.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
SE23.08.2017
NO23.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI23.08.2017
LT23.08.2017
NL23.08.2017
NO23.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT23.08.2017
NO23.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1366813  (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP [JP] JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
 [X]  - SPITZ J ET AL, "Proprietes et structure des couches minces de nitrure de niobium elaborees par pulverisation cathodique reactive I. Elaboration et proprietes", JOURNAL OF THE LESS-COMMON METALS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 35, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0022-5088(74)90230-6, ISSN 0022-5088, (19740401), pages 181 - 192, (19740401), XP024075389 [X] 1,4 * table 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-5088(74)90230-6
 [X]  - THIEDE T B ET AL, "Deposition of Niobium Nitride Thin Films from Tert-Butylamido-Tris-(Diethylamido)-Niobium by a Modified Industrial MOCVD Reactor", CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION, WILEY-VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, (20091201), vol. 15, no. 10-11-12, doi:10.1002/CVDE.200906810, ISSN 0948-1907, pages 334 - 341, XP001550209 [X] 1,4 * page 337, column lh, paragraph l *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cvde.200906810
 [X]  - FIX R ET AL, "CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION OF VANADIUM, NIOBIUM, AND TANTALUM NITRIDE THIN FILMS", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19930101), vol. 5, no. 5, doi:10.1021/CM00029A007, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 614 - 619, XP002920813 [X] 1,4 * page 616, column lh, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm00029a007
International search[X]KR100936490B  (UP CHEMICAL CO., LTD.);
 [XP]JP2012020246  (PANASONIC CORP.)
 [X]  - FIX, R. ET AL., "Chemical Vapor Deposition of Vanadium, Niobium, and Tantalum Nitride Thin Films", CHEM. MATER., (1993), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 614 - 619, XP002920813

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm00029a007
by applicantJPS51123779
 JP2003024764
 JP2002233769