Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818855

EP2818855 - GAS SENSOR ELEMENT, AND GAS SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.11.2014
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd.
14-18 Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi
Aichi 467-8525 / JP
[2016/01]
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
NGK Sparkplug Co., Ltd.
14-18 Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi 467-8525 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OTSUKA, Shigehiro
C/O NGK SPARK PLUG CO. LTD.
14-18 Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP
02 / ONKAWA, Masaki
C/O NGK SPARK PLUG CO. LTD.
14-18 Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP
03 / IWANO, Toru
C/O NGK SPARK PLUG CO. LTD.
14-18 Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP
04 / TERAMOTO, Satoshi
C/O NGK SPARK PLUG CO. LTD.
14-18 Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP
05 / TANAKA, Kuniharu
C/O NGK SPARK PLUG CO. LTD.
14-18 Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP
06 / MITSUOKA, Takeshi
C/O NGK SPARK PLUG CO. LTD.
14-18 Takatsuji-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8525 / JP
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Zimmermann & Partner
Josephspitalstr. 15
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date12855544.820.11.2012
WO2012IB56552
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013084097
Date:13.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2818855
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.11.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/407, G01N27/409, G01N27/41, G01N27/416, G01N27/419
[2015/46]
Former International [2015/01]G01N27/41, G01N27/409, G01N27/416, G01N27/419
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:GASSENSORELEMENT UND GASSENSOR[2015/01]
English:GAS SENSOR ELEMENT, AND GAS SENSOR[2015/01]
French:ÉLEMENT DE CAPTEUR DE GAZ, ET CAPTEUR DE GAZ[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase11.04.2014Translation filed 
11.04.2014National basic fee paid 
11.04.2014Search fee paid 
11.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
11.06.2014Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority
15.09.2014Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001
15.04.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]US2012211362  (ONKAWA MASAKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [YD]JP2007206082  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [YD] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1,2,6 * * paragraphs [0062] , [0076] , [0077] , [0083] , [0084] , [0111] , [0112] *;
 [Y]JP2009080110  (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 6 * * paragraphs [0044] , [0069] , [0070] *;
 [A]JP2006171013  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [A] 1-12 * claim - * * abstract * * figure - *;
 [A]CN1329247  (KANGDA CHENGDU ELECTRONIC CO L [CN]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figure - *;
 [A]DE102005062598  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0028] *;
 [A]EP0686847  (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP2009080110  (DENSO CORP);
 [A]JP2003322632  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO);
 [A]JPH10288593  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD)
by applicantJP2003322632
 JP2007206082