Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789483

EP2789483 - VEHICLE DOOR FRAME AND INNER MEMBER FOR VEHICLE DOOR FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.05.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) 
11.10.2019New entry: Payment of fee for grant 
11.10.2019New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Asahi-machi 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP
For all designated states
Hisada Co., Ltd.
11 Saburo
Satomachi
Anjo-shi, Aichi 446-0001 / JP
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / SATO, Eisuke
c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1 Asahi-machi 2-chome
Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP
02 / SAEKI, Masashi
c/o HISADA CO. LTD.
11 Saburo
Satomachi
Anjo-shi Aichi 446-0001 / JP
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date12855552.130.11.2012
WO2012JP81024
Priority number, dateJP2011027041409.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011270414
[2014/42]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013084801
Date:13.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789483
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:B23K11/11, B23K33/00, B23K101/00, B23K101/18, B23K103/04, B23K11/14, B60J5/04
[2019/20]
Former International [2014/42]B60J5/04, B23K11/00, B23K11/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUGTÜRRAHMEN UND INNENELEMENT FÜR FAHRZEUGTÜRRAHMEN[2014/42]
English:VEHICLE DOOR FRAME AND INNER MEMBER FOR VEHICLE DOOR FRAME[2014/42]
French:CADRE DE PORTE DE VÉHICULE ET ÉLÉMENT INTÉRIEUR POUR CADRE DE PORTE DE VÉHICULE[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2014Translation filed 
22.05.2014National basic fee paid 
22.05.2014Search fee paid 
22.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
18.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2019Fee for grant paid
09.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[YD]JP2011068181  (AISIN SEIKI; HISADA CO LTD) [YD] 1-6 * figures 1, 3-5; claims 1-3 *;
 [Y]JP2005259920  (HANSHIN ELECTRICS) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0011]; figures 3,6,7 *;
 [A]JP2004042089  (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,6 * paragraph [0032]; figure 2; claim 1 *
International search[Y]JP2011068181  (AISIN SEIKI CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2002239738  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.);
 [Y]JP2005259920  (HANSHIN ELECTRIC CO., LTD.)
by applicantJP2011068181