Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2785111 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2785111



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 678
22.05.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
30.07.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.06.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.06.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
07.06.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
07.06.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
05.06.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.06.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
05.06.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
31.01.2018 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
31.01.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
31.01.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
31.01.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
31.01.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
31.01.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 36
05.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
05.12.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
05.12.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
05.12.2017 Description Search / examination 2
05.12.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
05.12.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
30.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
30.11.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
30.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
30.11.2017 Description Search / examination 2
30.11.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
09.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
09.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
09.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
09.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
09.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
09.11.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
09.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
09.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
09.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
09.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
09.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
09.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
09.11.2017 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
09.11.2017 Description Search / examination 2
09.11.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 11
07.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
07.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
07.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
07.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
07.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
07.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
07.11.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
07.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
07.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
07.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
07.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
07.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
07.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
07.11.2017 Description Search / examination 2
07.11.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 11
13.07.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.07.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.07.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
11.07.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 9
11.07.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.07.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
28.11.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
24.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
24.11.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
24.11.2016 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
24.11.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
23.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
23.11.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
23.11.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
23.11.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.11.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.07.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
13.07.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.12.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.12.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
23.09.2015 Priority search results Search / examination 32
23.09.2015 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
09.09.2015 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
03.09.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
03.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
03.09.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
03.09.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
03.09.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 12
02.09.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
02.09.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
02.09.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
02.09.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
02.09.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 12
20.02.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
17.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
03.02.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.02.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 9
03.02.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
22.01.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 4
25.08.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.06.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
24.06.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
24.06.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 27
24.06.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 27
24.06.2014 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
24.06.2014 Amended drawings with annotations Search / examination 6
24.06.2014 Claims Search / examination 7
24.06.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
24.06.2014 Description Search / examination 27
24.06.2014 Drawings Search / examination 6
24.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
24.06.2014 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 13
22.04.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.07.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 36
13.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
13.06.2013 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
13.06.2013 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 35