Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2785111


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019 [2019/48]
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
24.05.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
11.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
21.12.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.01.2019  [2019/04]
29.06.2018 Change - divisional application(s) published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
15.06.2018 (Expected) grant published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
08.06.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
30.04.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
30.04.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
30.01.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.01.2018 Change - classification published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
12.01.2018 Change - classification published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
09.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.12.2017 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
01.12.2017 Change - classification published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
01.12.2017 Change - German title published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
01.12.2017 Change - English title published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
01.12.2017 Change - French title published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
10.07.2017 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
03.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.11.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.11.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.07.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.07.2016 First examination report
08.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.09.2015 Amendment by applicant
13.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
04.02.2015 Supplementary search report published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
30.01.2015 Change - classification published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
13.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
29.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
15.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.06.2014 Amendment by applicant
25.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
28.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication