Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2785111 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201110406270 CN201710225300 EP12855604 EP18179996



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018295536Global Dossier 11.10.2018A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN86059 06.12.2012
US201816005236 11.06.2018
US201615360772 23.11.2016
US201414299654 09.06.2014
CN201110406270 08.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10009787Global Dossier 26.06.2018B2
US2017078910 16.03.2017A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN86059 06.12.2012
US201615360772 23.11.2016
US201414299654 09.06.2014
CN201110406270 08.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9526055Global Dossier 20.12.2016B2
US2014369192 18.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN86059 06.12.2012
CN201110406270 08.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6017582BGlobal Dossier 02.11.2016B2
JP2015503292 29.01.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2012CN86059 06.12.2012
CN201110406270 08.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3462785Global Dossier 03.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN86059 06.12.2012
EP12855604 06.12.2012
CN201110406270 08.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107172684Global Dossier 15.09.2017A
Priority number Date
CN201710225300 08.12.2011
CN201110406270 08.12.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2785111Global Dossier 18.07.2018B1
EP2785111 04.03.2015A4
EP2785111 01.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2012CN86059 06.12.2012
CN201110406270 08.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013083059Global Dossier 13.06.2013A1
Priority number Date
CN201110406270 08.12.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN103167558BGlobal Dossier 19.04.2017B
CN103167558 19.06.2013A
Priority number Date
CN201110406270 08.12.2011
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3462785