Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785111

EP2785111 - METHOD AND NETWORK SIDE DEVICE FOR AIR INTERFACE OFFLOADING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/40]ACCESS METHOD AND SYSTEM, USER EQUIPMENT AND NETWORK SIDE DEVICE
[2018/01]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2018/29]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Hantao
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / HUANG, Min
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[2018/29]
Former [2014/40]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date12855604.006.12.2012
[2018/29]
WO2012CN86059
Priority number, dateCN20111040627008.12.2011         Original published format: CN201110406270
[2014/40]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013083059
Date:13.06.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785111
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785111
Date:18.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W48/20, // H04W36/22, H04W28/02, H04W84/12, H04W48/08, H04W36/00
[2018/01]
Former International [2015/10]H04W48/20, // H04W36/22, H04W28/02
Former International [2014/40]H04W48/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND NETZSEITIGE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTLASTUNG DER LUFTSCHNITTSTELLE[2018/01]
English:METHOD AND NETWORK SIDE DEVICE FOR AIR INTERFACE OFFLOADING[2018/01]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF CÔTÉ RÉSEAU POUR LE DÉLESTAGE DE L'INTERFACE RADIO[2018/01]
Former [2014/40]ZUGRIFFSVERFAHREN UND SYSTEM, BENUTZERGERÄT UND NETZSEITIGE VORRICHTUNG
Former [2014/40]ACCESS METHOD AND SYSTEM, USER EQUIPMENT AND NETWORK SIDE DEVICE
Former [2014/40]PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ACCÈS, ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET DISPOSITIF CÔTÉ RÉSEAU
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014Translation filed 
24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Search fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
02.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.12.2017
07.12.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
31.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.2018Fee for grant paid
26.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP18179996.6  / EP3462785
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.07.2016
Opposition(s)23.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
MC18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SI18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
IE06.12.2018
LU06.12.2018
[2019/48]
Former [2019/40]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
MC18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SI18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
LU06.12.2018
Former [2019/39]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SI18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
LU06.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SI18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/26]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/23]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
NO18.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL18.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011286437  (AUSTIN MARK DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,9,12,13,15,19,21,26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0006] , [0007] , [0009] - [0011] - [0036] , [0039] , [0040] , [0049] - [0052] - [0055] - [0057] - [0060] - [0063] - [0097] * * figure 3 * [I] 2,5,8,10,14,17,18,20,22-24;
 [IY]US2009278705  (CHHABRA KAPIL [US], et al) [I] 1-10,12-24,26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0011] - [0014] - [0016] - [0024] - [0026] , [0028] * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 11,25;
 [X]US2007140163  (MEIER ROBERT C [US], et al) [X] 1,6-10,12,13,19-26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] - [0012] - [0021] , [0022] , [0025] , [0026] , [0035] , [0036] , [0039] , [0040] , [0042] , [0043] , [0045] , [0047] , [0056] * * paragraphs [0058] - [0060] - [0062] , [0079] , [0080] , [0082] , [0085] , [0086] , [0088] * * figures 2,5,6 *;
 [IY]US2010195632  (PRABHU KRISHNANAND [IN]) [I] 1-3,6-9,12-15,19-21,26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] - [0009] - [0022] , [0032] - [0036] - [0041] , [0046] - [0051] * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 25;
 [Y]US2011222523  (FU I-KANG [TW], et al) [Y] 11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0010] - [0027] , [0029] , [0030] , [0043] - [0051] - [0054] * * figures 1,9,10 *
International search[X]CN101406090  (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]);
 [A]CN1479514  (SK TELECOMM CO LTD [KR])