Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790012

EP2790012 - LIGHTING DEVICE FOR INSPECTION AND LIGHTING METHOD FOR INSPECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CCS Inc.
374, Oukakuen-cho Shimodachiuriagaru Karasuma-dori Kamigyo-ku
Kyoto-City, Kyoto 602-8011 / JP
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / MASUMURA, Shigeki
c/o CCS Inc.
374 Okakuencho
Shimodachiuri-agaru
Karasuma-dori, Kamigyo-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 602-8011 / JP
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date12855609.927.11.2012
WO2012JP80648
Priority number, dateJP2011026732106.12.2011         Original published format: JP 2011267321
[2014/42]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013084755
Date:13.06.2013
Language:JA
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790012
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/84, G01B11/30, G01N21/88
[2015/28]
Former International [2014/42]G01N21/84, G01B11/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR INSPEKTION UND BELEUCHTUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR INSPEKTION[2014/42]
English:LIGHTING DEVICE FOR INSPECTION AND LIGHTING METHOD FOR INSPECTION[2014/42]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉCLAIRAGE D'INSPECTION[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2014Translation filed 
01.07.2014National basic fee paid 
01.07.2014Search fee paid 
01.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
23.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
12.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2009147247  (ENDO KAZUMASA [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,11 * paragraphs [0047] - [0056]; figures 1,3 * [Y] 8,9;
 [XY]US2006268265  (CHUANG YUNG-HO [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11 * paragraphs [0034] , [0047]; figure 12 * [Y] 9;
 [XY]WO2010034433  (ZEISS CARL SMS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11 * page 19, line 26 - page 21, line 11; figure 1 * [Y] 9;
 [YA]US2002015148  (TOMOMATSU RYUZOU [JP]) [Y] 8 * column 5, lines 28-48; figure 1 * [A] 1,10;
 [YA]US5737074  (HAGA KAZUMI [JP], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0075] - [0083]; figure 1 * [A] 1,10;
 [YA]US6690469  (SHIBATA YUKIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 9 * figure 1(a) * [A] 1,10;
 [A]JP2006258472  (NIKON CORP) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2005148296  (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 1,10 * abstract *
International search[X]JP2005148296  (OLYMPUS CORP.);
 [X]JP2009019882  (NIKON CORP.);
 [Y]JP2007133435  (HAYASHI CREATIVE LAB. CO., LTD.);
 [Y]JP2006046946  (SHINSHU UNIVERSITY);
 [Y]JP2008076962  (OKANO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.);
 [A]JP2011028249  (OLYMPUS CORP.);
 [A]JP2006258472  (NIKON CORP.)
by applicantJPH10261839