Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2788420

EP2788420 - CELLULOSE ESTERS IN HIGHLY-FILLED ELASTOMERIC SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.09.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Chemical Company
200 South Wilcox Drive
Kingsport, TN 37660 / US
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / BASU, Soumendra, Kumar
1825 W. Lakeview Drive
Apt. C-27
Johnson City, TN 37601 / US
02 / HELMER, Bradley, James
1080 Rotherwood Drive
Kingsport, TN 37660 / US
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Best, Michael , et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date12855885.506.12.2012
[2017/43]
WO2012US68096
Priority number, dateUS201161567950P07.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161567950 P
US201161567948P07.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161567948 P
US201161567951P07.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161567951 P
US201161567953P07.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161567953 P
US20121369100730.11.2012         Original published format: US201213691007
US20121369094430.11.2012         Original published format: US201213690944
US20121369096830.11.2012         Original published format: US201213690968
US20121369091930.11.2012         Original published format: US201213690919
US20121369090930.11.2012         Original published format: US201213690909
US20121369093030.11.2012         Original published format: US201213690930
US20121369095330.11.2012         Original published format: US201213690953
US20121369093730.11.2012         Original published format: US201213690937
US20121369094530.11.2012         Original published format: US201213690945
US20121369093530.11.2012         Original published format: US201213690935
US20121369098130.11.2012         Original published format: US201213690981
US20121369095830.11.2012         Original published format: US201213690958
US20121369089030.11.2012         Original published format: US201213690890
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013086085
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2788420
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2788420
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:C08L1/10, C08L1/20
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:CELLULOSEESTER IN HOCH GEFÜLLTEN ELASTOMERSYSTEMEN[2014/42]
English:CELLULOSE ESTERS IN HIGHLY-FILLED ELASTOMERIC SYSTEMS[2014/42]
French:ESTERS DE CELLULOSE UTILISÉS DANS DES SYSTÈMES ÉLASTOMÉRIQUES HAUTEMENT CHARGÉS[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase18.06.2014National basic fee paid 
18.06.2014Search fee paid 
18.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
26.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.08.2017Fee for grant paid
18.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.09.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
19.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2017
Opposition(s)26.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
IE06.12.2017
MT06.12.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
[2018/45]
Former [2018/43]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
MT06.12.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
IT25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL25.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2588518  (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [E] 1-20 * example 4 *;
 [IP]WO2012006133  (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [IP] 1-20 * example 4 * * page 20, paragraph 2 *;
 [I]EP0795581  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [I] 1-20 * table 1 * * page 4, lines 5-17 *;
 [I]US6273163  (MATERNE THIERRY FLORENT EDM EA [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * table 1 * * column 8, lines 5-14 *;
 [I]EP1400560  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [I] 1-20 * table 4 * * paragraphs [0029] , [0034] - [0036] *;
 [A]EP1086830  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-20 * table 1 *;
 [A]US2003092801  (AGOSTINI GIORGIO [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2305750  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2004182486  (BERNARD CARLO [LU], et al);
 [Y]US4358553  (CORAN AUBERT Y, et al);
 [Y]US2011046272  (SMITS VALERIE [BE], et al);
 [Y]US2010305249  (BUCHANAN CHARLES MICHAEL [US], et al);
 [AP]US2011319529  (HELMER BRADLEY JAMES [US], et al);
 [A]US2011160354  (KOUNO YOSHIHIDE [JP], et al);
 [A]US5672639  (CORVASCE FILOMENO GENNARO [IT], et al)