Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2788844

EP2788844 - ELECTRODE PATTERN OF TOUCH PANEL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Innotek Co., Ltd.
98, Huam-ro, Jung-gu
Seoul, 04637 / KR
[2017/20]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
LG Innotek Co., Ltd.
20th Floor, Seoul Square
416 Hangang-daero
Jung-gu
Seoul 100-714 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / JANG, Jae Joon
c/o LG Innotek Co. Ltd.
Seoul Square 416
Hangang-daero
Jung-gu
100-714 Seoul / KR
02 / HONG, Hyuk Jin
c/o LG Innotek Co. Ltd.
Seoul Square 416
Hangang-daero
Jung-gu
100-714 Seoul / KR
03 / JO, Ji Won
c/o LG Innotek Co. Ltd.
Seoul Square 416
Hangang-daero
Jung-gu
100-714 Seoul / KR
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Novagraaf Technologies
Bâtiment O2
2, rue Sarah Bernhardt
CS90017
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Novagraaf Technologies
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date12856100.830.11.2012
WO2012KR10270
Priority number, dateKR2011013064608.12.2011         Original published format: KR 20110130646
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013085227
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2788844
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/041, G06F3/044, H01B13/00, H01B5/14
[2015/29]
Former International [2014/42]G06F3/041, H01B13/00, H01B5/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRODENMUSTER FÜR EINEN BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRM UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/42]
English:ELECTRODE PATTERN OF TOUCH PANEL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2014/42]
French:CONFIGURATION D'ÉLECTRODE D'UN ÉCRAN TACTILE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase30.05.2014National basic fee paid 
30.05.2014Search fee paid 
30.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
04.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.04.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
23.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US2011169783  (WANG ET AL) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031]; figures 4-5C *;
 [X]US2009242283  (CHIU) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0035]; figures 2-4 *;
 [XI]US2011242021  (JUN ET AL) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,11,13-15 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1,2 * [I] 12;
 [X]US2011193801  (JUNG ET AL) [X] 1-9,12-15 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0070]; figures 5,6 *
International search[X]KR20110032604  (CRATTO INC. ET AL.);
 [A]US2010283757  (WU, KUN-LONG ET AL.);
 [A]KR20110070274  (LG DISPLAY CO., LTD.);
 [A]KR101055379B  (FAN, LI-LI);
 [A]US2008264699  (CHANG, CHING-YANG ET AL.)