Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2788844


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.10.2019 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
26.04.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.04.2019 First examination report
27.11.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.04.2017 Change - applicant published on  17.05.2017  [2017/20]
25.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.01.2016 Amendment by applicant
28.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.06.2015 Change - classification published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
12.06.2015 Change - classification published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
12.06.2015 Change - date of supplementary search report published on  15.07.2015  [2015/29]
13.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
02.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
12.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
17.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
27.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.06.2014 Amendment by applicant
31.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication