Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2788410

EP2788410 - METHOD FOR THE ADHESION OF A LAYER OF FLUOROSILICONE RUBBER TO A LAYER OF SILICONE RUBBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Corning (China) Holding Co. Ltd.
1077 Zhangheng Road, Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park
Pudong District
Shanghai 201203 / CN
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Shaohui
No. 1077, Zhangheng Road,
Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park
Pudong District
Shanghai 201203 / CN
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Fyfe, Fiona Allison Watson
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date12856103.212.11.2012
[2016/33]
WO2012CN84439
Priority number, dateCN20111040681908.12.2011         Original published format: CN201110406819
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013082989
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2788410
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2788410
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:C08J5/12, B32B27/08
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBRINGEN EINER SCHICHT AUS FLUORSILIKONKAUTSCHUK AUF EINE SCHICHT AUS SILIKONKAUTSCHUK[2014/42]
English:METHOD FOR THE ADHESION OF A LAYER OF FLUOROSILICONE RUBBER TO A LAYER OF SILICONE RUBBER[2014/42]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ADHÉSION D'UNE COUCHE DE CAOUTCHOUC DE FLUOROSILICONE À UNE COUCHE DE CAOUTCHOUC DE SILICONE[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase06.06.2014National basic fee paid 
06.06.2014Search fee paid 
06.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
04.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.2016Fee for grant paid
05.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.05.2016
Opposition(s)18.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.11.2012
AL17.08.2016
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
TR17.08.2016
IE12.11.2016
MT12.11.2016
BG17.11.2016
GB17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU12.11.2012
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
TR17.08.2016
IE12.11.2016
MT12.11.2016
BG17.11.2016
GB17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2018/43]HU12.11.2012
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
IE12.11.2016
MT12.11.2016
BG17.11.2016
GB17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2018/30]HU12.11.2012
AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CY17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IS17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
MC17.08.2016
MK17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
IE12.11.2016
BG17.11.2016
GB17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/51]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
IE12.11.2016
BG17.11.2016
GB17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/43]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SI17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/35]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/23]AT17.08.2016
BE17.08.2016
CZ17.08.2016
DK17.08.2016
EE17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RO17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
SK17.08.2016
SM17.08.2016
BG17.11.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
LV17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT17.08.2016
ES17.08.2016
FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
GR18.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
PT19.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI17.08.2016
HR17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
PL17.08.2016
RS17.08.2016
SE17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI17.08.2016
IT17.08.2016
LT17.08.2016
NL17.08.2016
NO17.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT17.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2006120186  (DOW CORNING [US]; DOW CORNING SPA [IT]; DRAKE ROBERT [GB]; CUOCCI BRUN) [A] 1-11 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP1770112  (WACKER CHEMIE AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * page 2, paragraphs 6-7 * * page 3, paragraphs 13-14 * * page 4, paragraphs 24,27 * * page 5, paragraph 37 * * examples 6-10 *;
 [A]WO0013891  (DYNEON LLC [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 31 *;
 [A]GB2068397  (TORAY SILICONE CO) [A] 1-11 * page 1, lines 21-26 * * example 5 * * table 1 *;
 [A]WO2009054552  (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD [JP]; MORIMOTO HIROTOKI [JP]; TSUJI YUICHI [J) [A] 1-11 * page 2, paragraph 6 * * page 4, paragraph 14 * * page 5, paragraphs 17-18 *
International search[X]US2008308227  (DOW CORNING CORP ET AL.);
 [A]JPH0317169  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO LTD);
 [A]CN102241936  (KAIPING SOLID COATING REFLECTIVE CO LTD);
 [A]CN102168500  (CHONGQING DAZHONG EROSION PROOF CO LTD)