Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789457

EP2789457 - TIRE-FORMING MACHINE CONNECTOR APPARATUS AND CONNECTOR HANDLING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.12.2017  [2017/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mesnac Co. Ltd.
N°.43 Zhengzhou Road
Sifang Qingdao
266042 Shandong, China / CN
[2015/21]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Yuan, Zhongxue
Room 3-401, Building No. 4
No. 37, Tangshang Road
Qingdao, Shandong / CN
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
Yuan, Zhongxue
No.43 Zhengzhou Road
Sifang
Qingdao
Shandong 266042 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / YUAN, Zhongxue
MESNAC Co., Ltd.
No.43 Zhengzhou Road
Sifang Qingdao
Shandong 266042 / CN
02 / CHENG, Jiguo
MESNAC Co., Ltd.
No.43 Zhengzhou Road
Sifang Qingdao
Shandong 266042 / CN
03 / ZHOU, Fude
MESNAC Co., Ltd.
No.43 Zhengzhou Road
Sifang Qingdao
Shandong 266042 / CN
04 / SHAO, Rui
MESNAC Co., Ltd.
No.43 Zhengzhou Road
Sifang Qingdao
Shandong 266042 / CN
05 / DAI, Chunhai
MESNAC Co., Ltd.
No.43 Zhengzhou Road
Sifang Qingdao
Shandong 266042 / CN
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Rentsch Partner AG
Bellerivestrasse 203
Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Rentsch Partner AG
Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte
Fraumünsterstrasse 9
Postfach 2441
8022 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date12856108.107.12.2012
WO2012CN86143
Priority number, dateCN2011140278307.12.2011         Original published format: CN201110402783
[2014/42]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013083069
Date:13.06.2013
Language:ZH
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789457
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:B29D30/20, B29D30/26, B29D30/28, B29D30/32
[2016/04]
Former International [2014/42]B29D30/08, B29D30/14, B29D30/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:VERBINDERVORRICHTUNG FÜR REIFENHERSTELLUNGSMASCHINE UND VERBINDERHANDHABUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/42]
English:TIRE-FORMING MACHINE CONNECTOR APPARATUS AND CONNECTOR HANDLING METHOD THEREFOR[2014/42]
French:APPAREIL DE RACCORDEMENT DE MACHINE DE FORMATION DE PNEUMATIQUES ET PROCÉDÉ DE MANIPULATION DE RACCORDEMENT POUR CET APPAREIL[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2014Translation filed 
17.06.2014National basic fee paid 
17.06.2014Search fee paid 
17.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
21.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/52]
23.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/52]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[AP]CN202412722U  (MESNAV CO LTD) [AP] 1-10 * figures 1-4 *;
 [AP]CN202344862U  (MESNAV CO LTD) [AP] 1-10 * figures 1-6 *;
 [AP]CN202412719U  (MESNAV CO LTD) [AP] 1-10 * figures 1-4 *;
 [E]CN103144333  (MESNAV CO LTD) [E] 1-10 * figures 1-4 *;
 [E]WO2013083071  (YUAN ZHONGXUE [CN]) [E] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [E]EP2789456  (YUAN ZHONGXUE [CN]) [E] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]CN101372155  (QINGDAO MESNAC CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]CN2889706Y  (GUO HONGSHENG [CN]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US5948207  (HUISMAN H [NL] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [E]EP2799218  (YUAN ZHONGXUE [CN]) [E] 1-10 * abstract *
International search[A]CN101372155  (QINGDAO MESNAC CO., LTD.);
 [A]CN1871118  (MATADOR AS);
 [A]CN2875777Y  (GUO, HONGSHENG);
 [A]CN2889706Y  (GUO, HONGSHENG);
 [A]US2614952  (GEN TIRE & RUBBER CO)