Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787994

EP2787994 - ORAL FORMULATIONS FOR TREATING METAL OVERLOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.02.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 08.03.2017  [2017/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ferrokin Biosciences, Inc.
725 Chesterbrook Blvd.
Wayne, PA 19087-5637 / US
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / RIENHOFF, Hugh, Y., Jr.
2729 Debbie Court
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date12856135.407.12.2012
WO2012US68432
Priority number, dateUS201161568914P09.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161568914 P
US201161568890P09.12.2011         Original published format: US 201161568890 P
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013086312
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2787994
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/426, A61K9/48, A61P39/04
[2015/35]
Former International [2014/42]A61K31/426, C07D277/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBA27.06.2014
ME27.06.2014
TitleGerman:ORALE FORMULIERUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON METALLÜBERLASTUNG[2014/42]
English:ORAL FORMULATIONS FOR TREATING METAL OVERLOAD[2014/42]
French:FORMULATIONS ORALES POUR TRAITER UNE SURCHARGE EN MÉTAL[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2014National basic fee paid 
27.06.2014Search fee paid 
27.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
24.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.01.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]  - NEUFELD ELLIS J ET AL, "Safety, Tolerability and Dose Response of FBS0701, a Novel Iron Chelator for Treatment of Transfusional Iron Overload: Results of a 24-Week Multicenter, International Phase 2 Study", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (201111), Database accession no. PREV201200217975, XP055203153 [I] 1-15 * abstract *
    [ ] - ELLIS J NEUFELD ET AL, "Paper: Safety, Tolerability and Dose Response of FBS0701, a Novel Iron Chelator for Treatment of Transfusional Iron Overload: Results of a 24-Week Multicenter, International Phase 2 Study", BLOOD, (20111118), vol. 118, no. 21, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 315 - 316, XP055203146 [ ] * abstract *
 [I]  - H. Y. RIENHOFF ET AL, "A phase 1 dose-escalation study: safety, tolerability, and pharmacokinetics of FBS0701, a novel oral iron chelator for the treatment of transfusional iron overload", HAEMATOLOGICA, (20101220), vol. 96, no. 4, doi:10.3324/haematol.2010.034405, ISSN 0390-6078, pages 521 - 525, XP055203044 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 525, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3324/haematol.2010.034405
International search[X]US2010137383  (TAPPER ET AL.);
 [Y]US2009264484  (TIDMARSH ET AL.);
 [AP]US2012202857  (TAPPER ET AL.)
 [Y]  - AZARMI ET AL., "Current perspectives in dissolution testing of conventional and novel dosage forms", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, vol. 328, (2007), pages 12 - 21, URL: www.sciencedirect.com, (20130118), XP005787877

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2006.10.001