Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2788837

EP2788837 - IMMEDIATE PURCHASE OF GOODS AND SERVICES WHICH APPEAR ON A PUBLIC BROADCAST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.05.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Morot-Gaudry, Jean Michel
1408 Domingo Road
Fullerton, CA 92835 / US
For all designated states
Roselli, Christopher Michael
220 Lonetree
Irvine, CA 92603 / US
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Fenlon, Christine Lesley
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date12856371.505.12.2012
WO2012US67871
Priority number, dateUS20111331279006.12.2011         Original published format: US201113312790
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013085953
Date:13.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2788837
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.2013
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.06.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/00, G06Q30/02, G06Q30/06, H04N21/2547
[2015/33]
Former International [2014/42]G06F3/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:DIREKTKAUF VON PRODUKTEN UND DIENSTLEISTUNGEN IN EINEM ÖFFENTLICHEN RUNDFUNK[2014/42]
English:IMMEDIATE PURCHASE OF GOODS AND SERVICES WHICH APPEAR ON A PUBLIC BROADCAST[2014/42]
French:ACHAT IMMÉDIAT DE PRODUITS ET DE SERVICES QUI APPARAISSENT SUR UNE DIFFUSION PUBLIQUE[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2014National basic fee paid 
03.07.2014Search fee paid 
03.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
05.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.05.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US2010154007  (TOUBOUL JEAN [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010030578  (SIDDIQUE M A SAMI [CA], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2010154007  (TOUBOUL JEAN [US], et al);
 [Y]US2010030578  (SIDDIQUE M A SAMI [CA], et al);
 [A]US2011093875  (SIMMONS BONNIE J [US], et al);
 [A]US2010057813  (ABE KEIKO [JP], et al);
 [A]US2002120934  (ABRAHAMS MARC [US])